This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/29/2017 at 12:50:52 (UTC).

Lian Wu vs. Jiaru Zhang

Case Summary

On 01/21/2010 Lian Wu filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jiaru Zhang. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8764

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2010

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wu, Lian

Defendants

Does 1-10

Zhang, Jiaru

Waking The Village LLC

Cross Defendants

Roes 1-20

Does 1-20

Schwall, Michael Alan

Villarreal, Paula

Jones, Megan

Arbitrators

Arruti, Mark

Del Bino, Jon J.

McKone Jr, Michael M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael D Tracy

Defendant Attorney

Douglas A Sears

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Terrence T Snook

Stephen Mason

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Wu, Lian(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Wu, Lian(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Wu, Lian(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Waking The Village LLC(Defendant); Zhang, Jiaru(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Waking The Village LLC(Cross - Complainant); Zhang, Jiaru(Cross - Complainant))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Waking The Village LLC(Cross - Complainant); Zhang, Jiaru(Cross - Complainant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Zhang, Jiaru(Cross - Complainant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Wu, Lian(Plaintiff))

General Denial filed.

General Denial filed. (Filed By: Schwall, Michael(Cross - Defendant); Villarreal, Paula(Cross - Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Schwall, Michael(Cross - Complainant); Villarreal, Paula(Cross - Complainant))

Summons (Issued) filed.

Summons (Issued) filed. (Filed By: Schwall, Michael(Cross - Complainant); Villarreal, Paula(Cross - Complainant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Schwall, Michael(Cross - Complainant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Wu, Lian(Cross - Defendant))

Order for Supplemental Case Management Statement on Limited Civil Case generated .

Order for Supplemental Case Management Statement on Limited Civil Case generated .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Schwall, Michael(Cross - Complainant); Villarreal, Paula(Cross - Complainant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Jones, Megan(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Schwall, Michael(Cross - Complainant); Villarreal, Paula(Cross - Complainant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Jones, Megan(Cross - Defendant))

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2011
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Arbitrator Selection Process; Department: ARB; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2011
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Arbitration - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/17/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 44 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Waking The Village LLC(Defendant); Zhang, Jiaru(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2011
  • DocketCross-Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Schwall, Michael(Cross - Complainant); Villarreal, Paula(Cross - Complainant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAward of Arbitrator filed. (Filed By: Del Bino, Jon(Arbitrator))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (complaint) filed. (Filed By: Wu, Lian(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorneys Compliance Statement filed. (Filed By: Jones, Megan(Cross - Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice-Order to Show Cause For Failure To Comply

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Waking The Village LLC(Cross - Complainant); Zhang, Jiaru(Cross - Complainant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • DocketRoes 1-20 added as a Cross - Defendant effective 02/22/2010 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • DocketVillarreal, Paula added as a Cross - Defendant effective 02/22/2010 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • DocketSchwall, Michael Alan added as a Cross - Defendant effective 02/22/2010 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed. (Filed By: Waking The Village LLC(Defendant); Zhang, Jiaru(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2010
  • DocketSears, Douglas A added as a effective 02/22/2010 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 44 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Wu, Lian(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Wu, Lian(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Wu, Lian(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Terrence T Snook