Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/19/2017 at 22:08:16 (UTC).

Lenard S Zipperian vs. Pacific Gas and Electric Company

Case Summary

On 12/01/2015 Lenard S Zipperian filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Pacific Gas and Electric Company. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7369

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alpen Ventures LLC

Lenard S Zipperian as Trustee of the Shamrock Ranch Trust Agreement and Declarat

Zipperian, Judith M.

Zipperian, Lenard S.

Defendants

Bowa, Lawrence

City of Sacramento

Clement, Frances

Does 1-500

Edelmayer, Eric

Edelmayer, Franz

Edelmayer, Susan

Haberman, Ingrid

Haberman, Sylvester

Havlick & Hughes

Mansford West Company Inc

Miller, Bertero

Miller, Borghild

North American Title Company

Pacific Gas and Electric Company

Perednia, David

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark E Ellinghouse

Defendant Attorneys

James Sanchez

Steve Schirle

Other Attorneys

Margery Q Lee

Jozel Brunett

W Christopher Sims

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/02/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/02/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Declaration - Other (Of M.Ellinghouse) filed.

Declaration - Other (Of M.Ellinghouse) filed. (Filed By: Lenard S Zipperian as Trustee of the Shamrock Ranch Trust Agreement and Declaration of Trust Dated April 1 1968 1990 Third Street Associates(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Judith(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

Disclaimer filed.

Disclaimer filed. (Filed By: State of California Franchise Tax Board(Defendant))

Request - Entry of Default filed.

Request - Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: Lenard S Zipperian as Trustee of the Shamrock Ranch Trust Agreement and Declaration of Trust Dated April 1 1968 1990 Third Street Associates(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

Request - Entry of Default filed.

Request - Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: Alpen Ventures LLC(Plaintiff))

Request - Entry of Default filed.

Request - Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: Alpen Ventures LLC(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Alpen Ventures LLC(Plaintiff); Lenard S Zipperian as Trustee of the Shamrock Ranch Trust Agreement and Declaration of Trust Dated April 1 1968 1990 Third Street Associates(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Judith(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Alpen Ventures LLC(Plaintiff); Lenard S Zipperian as Trustee of the Shamrock Ranch Trust Agreement and Declaration of Trust Dated April 1 1968 1990 Third Street Associates(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Judith(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

Notice - Other (of Non-Opposition to plfs Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint) filed.

Notice - Other (of Non-Opposition to plfs Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Alpen Ventures LLC(Plaintiff); Lenard S Zipperian as Trustee of the Shamrock Ranch Trust Agreement and Declaration of Trust Dated April 1 1968 1990 Third Street Associates(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Judith(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Zipperian, Judith(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Motion to File Amended Complaint - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/29/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to File Amended Complaint - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/29/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Zipperian, Judith(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to File Amended Complaint - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 30; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Zipperian, Judith(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer (to First Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: The State of California, acting by and through the Department of Transportation(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Sims, W Christopher added as a effective 08/12/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Alpen Ventures LLC(Plaintiff); Lenard S Zipperian as Trustee of the Shamrock Ranch Trust Agreement and Declaration of Trust Dated April 1 1968 1990 Third Street Associates(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Judith(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Complaint (First) filed. (Filed By: Alpen Ventures LLC(Plaintiff); Lenard S Zipperian as Trustee of the Shamrock Ranch Trust Agreement and Declaration of Trust Dated April 1 1968 1990 Third Street Associates(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Judith(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2016
  • Brunett, Jozel added as a effective 02/01/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Of M.Ellinghouse) filed. (Filed By: Lenard S Zipperian as Trustee of the Shamrock Ranch Trust Agreement and Declaration of Trust Dated April 1 1968 1990 Third Street Associates(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Judith(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Points and Authorities (In Support of Application to Publish Summons) filed. (Filed By: Lenard S Zipperian as Trustee of the Shamrock Ranch Trust Agreement and Declaration of Trust Dated April 1 1968 1990 Third Street Associates(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Judith(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Order for Publication of Summons filed. (Filed By: Lenard S Zipperian as Trustee of the Shamrock Ranch Trust Agreement and Declaration of Trust Dated April 1 1968 1990 Third Street Associates(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Judith(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 30 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/02/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 30 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/03/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Alpen Ventures LLC(Plaintiff); Lenard S Zipperian as Trustee of the Shamrock Ranch Trust Agreement and Declaration of Trust Dated April 1 1968 1990 Third Street Associates(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Judith(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Alpen Ventures LLC(Plaintiff); Lenard S Zipperian as Trustee of the Shamrock Ranch Trust Agreement and Declaration of Trust Dated April 1 1968 1990 Third Street Associates(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Judith(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2015
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Alpen Ventures LLC(Plaintiff); Lenard S Zipperian as Trustee of the Shamrock Ranch Trust Agreement and Declaration of Trust Dated April 1 1968 1990 Third Street Associates(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Judith(Plaintiff); Zipperian, Lenard(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where City of Sacramento is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTH AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Pacific Gas and Electric Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRUNETT JOZEL