This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/30/2017 at 19:16:36 (UTC).

LAURIE THOMAS HARVICK. ETAL VS. KALEEN RAE O'CALLAGHAN.ETAL

Case Summary

On 06/13/2006 LAURIE THOMAS HARVICK ETAL filed an Other lawsuit against KALEEN RAE O'CALLAGHAN ETAL. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2424

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Harvick, Laurie Thomas

Hall, Caleb

Hall, Kristi

Harvick, David

Hall, Jason

Hall, Jacob

Defendants

Moniz, Christopher

O'Callaghan, Kaleen R.

Arbitrators

Grader, Samuel Gilbert

Thompson, Tiza S.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Larry K Eslinger

Frank Reynoso

Defendant Attorney

Geraldine Barrows

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/15/2007 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/15/2007 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 01/17/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program set on 01/17/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Arbitration - Case Management Program set on 10/23/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Arbitration - Case Management Program set on 10/23/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program heard on 01/17/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Compliance - Case Management Program heard on 01/17/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel Discovery - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/13/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel Discovery - Civil Law and Motion heard on 03/13/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Motion for Sanctions filed.

Motion for Sanctions filed. (Filed By: O'Callaghan, Kaleen(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/13/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/13/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/13/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 05/13/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Notice Re Status of Arbitration Proceedings generated .

Notice Re Status of Arbitration Proceedings generated .

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Hall, Caleb(Plaintiff); Hall, Jacob(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (Geraldine Barrows in support of order for sanctions) filed.

Declaration - Other (Geraldine Barrows in support of order for sanctions) filed. (Filed By: O'Callaghan, Kaleen(Defendant))

Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order RE Sanctions) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order RE Sanctions) filed. (Filed By: O'Callaghan, Kaleen(Defendant))

Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order RE Sanctions) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (Notice of Entry of Order RE Sanctions) filed. (Filed By: O'Callaghan, Kaleen(Defendant))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Hall, Jason(Plaintiff))

Opposition to Noticed Motion (motion for reconsideration) filed.

Opposition to Noticed Motion (motion for reconsideration) filed. (Filed By: O'Callaghan, Kaleen(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Arbitration - Case Management Program heard on 10/23/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Arbitration - Case Management Program heard on 10/23/2008 08:30:00 AM .

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Harvick, Laurie(Plaintiff))

Notice Re Status of Arbitration Proceedings generated .

Notice Re Status of Arbitration Proceedings generated .

67 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Reconsideration - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Arbitrator Selection Process; Department: ARB; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Arbitration - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Arbitrator Selection Process; Department: ARB; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
131 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • CMP Packet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • Case assigned to Department 45 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • O'Callaghan, Kaleen R. added as a Defendant effective 06/13/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • Moniz, Christopher added as a Defendant effective 06/13/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • Harvick, Laurie Thomas added as a Plaintiff effective 06/13/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • Harvick, David added as a Plaintiff effective 06/13/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • Hall, Kristi added as a Plaintiff effective 06/13/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • Hall, Jason added as a Plaintiff effective 06/13/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • Hall, Jacob added as a Plaintiff effective 06/13/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2007
  • Hall, Caleb added as a Plaintiff effective 06/13/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less