This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/30/2017 at 21:45:58 (UTC).

Kristin McAllister vs. County of Sacramento

Case Summary

On 06/26/2006 Kristin McAllister filed an Other lawsuit against County of Sacramento. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2705

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

McAllister, Kristen

Defendants

St. Francis Home for Children

Families First

University of California Davis Medical Center

Kair In Home Social Services Inc

Bruderlin, Tom

Triad Family Services

Francis, Lydia

Sacramento County Mental Health

Her, Bee

Morose, Robin

Palmer, Karen

Love, Rhonda

Hemm, Marie

State department of Social Services by & Through Foster Family Home and Small Family Home Insurance fund, families first

hemm, Robert

St Francis Home For Children

Scripps Psychological Associates, Inc.

Dunning, Edward

Shaw, Claudia

45 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cyrus Zal

Defendant Attorneys

Michael A Bishop

Dwight B Bishop

Carol A Wieckowski

Melissa Blair Aliotti

Other Attorneys

David R. Vogl

Ellen C Arabian-Lee

Michael J Baytosh

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program set on 02/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program set on 02/28/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 07/10/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 07/10/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/15/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/15/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/16/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/16/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/23/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/23/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/22/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/22/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/10/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/10/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/11/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/11/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 05/27/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 05/27/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: McAllister, Kristen(Plaintiff))

Motion to Quash Service of Summons filed.

Motion to Quash Service of Summons filed. (Filed By: Associated Family Therapy For Effective Recovery(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Sutter Health Sacramento Sierra Region(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: McAllister, Kristen(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Demurrer by def Child and Family Inst to Plaintiffs 2nd Amended complaint) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Demurrer by def Child and Family Inst to Plaintiffs 2nd Amended complaint) filed. (Filed By: Child and Family Institute(Defendant))

Demurrer filed.

Demurrer filed. (Filed By: St Francis Home For Children(Defendant))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: McAllister, Kristen(Plaintiff))

Order and Judgment of Dismissal in Favor of St Francis Home for Children (Updated with Costs posted per Memo of Costs)

Order and Judgment of Dismissal in Favor of St Francis Home for Children (Updated with Costs posted per Memo of Costs)

299 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 45; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
549 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2007
  • Boyle, Cathy added as a Defendant effective 08/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2007
  • Bardo, Theresa added as a Defendant effective 08/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2007
  • Austin, Faye added as a Defendant effective 08/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2007
  • Associated Family Therapy For Effective Recovery added as a Defendant effective 08/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2007
  • Aspira Foster Family Services added as a Defendant effective 08/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2007
  • Bryce McAllister, by & through his Guardian as litem, Kristen McAllister added as a Plaintiff effective 08/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2007
  • Jared McAllister, by & through his Guardian as litem, Kristen McAllister added as a Plaintiff effective 08/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2007
  • McAllister, Joseph added as a Plaintiff effective 08/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2007
  • McAllister, Kristen added as a Plaintiff effective 08/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2007
  • WOLFF, JULIE LYNN added as a Attorney effective 08/16/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less