This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/29/2017 at 15:14:34 (UTC).

KIRK ROWERT ET AL VS LENNAR RENAISSANCE. INC ET AL

Case Summary

On 01/27/2006 KIRK ROWERT filed an Other lawsuit against LENNAR RENAISSANCE INC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0351

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Pacific Bay Homes, LLC

Winncrest Homes, Inc.

Lennar Sales Corp

Pacific Bay Properties

HRA Enviremental Consultants Inc.

Winncrest Homes II

Lennar Renaissance, Inc.

FN Projects, Inc.

FN Development Company Alpha

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Pacific Bay Homes LLC

Winncrest Homes, Inc.

KRC Builders, Inc

Kenyon Plastering Inc

Zimmerman Roofing

Newell Roofing

Pacific Bay Properties

K C Vance Corporation

Kenyon Construction Inc

Garnas & Rabe Construction Inc

Milgard Manufacturing, Inc.

Guardian Ad Litem

Rowert, Tonya

Intervenor

Winncrest Homes Inc

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Palumbo, Bergstrom, LLP

Murphy Campbell Et al

Wilson, Elser, Et al

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Murphy Campbell Et al

Paul B Walsh

Deborah A Correll

Other Attorneys

Benjamin W Blaisdell

Suzanne A Tollefson

John C Miller

Miller Law Inc

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 03/18/2009 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 03/18/2009 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 07/16/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 07/16/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 09/17/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 09/17/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 12/10/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 12/10/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 03/11/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 03/11/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Winncrest Homes, Inc.(Cross - Defendant))

Objection (to evidence submitted in opposition) filed.

Objection (to evidence submitted in opposition) filed. (Filed By: Pacific Bay Homes, LLC(Defendant); Pacific Bay Properties(Defendant))

Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement filed.

Motion to Determine Good Faith Settlement filed. (Filed By: D&J Plumbing Inc.(Cross - Defendant))

Motion for Continuance of Trial filed.

Motion for Continuance of Trial filed. (Filed By: Pacific Bay Properties(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed.

Declaration - Other (Oz Tannenbaum in accordance with CRC 3.1312(b)) filed.

Declaration - Other (Oz Tannenbaum in accordance with CRC 3.1312(b)) filed.

Summons filed.

Summons filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment filed. (Filed By: Winncrest Homes Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Amendment to Cross-Complaint filed.

Amendment to Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Pacific Bay Properties(Cross - Complainant))

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 10/14/2008 09:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion heard on 10/14/2008 09:30:00 AM .

Ex Parte Application - Other (of Pacific Bay Properties and Winncrest Homes Inc to Continue Trial Date) filed.

Ex Parte Application - Other (of Pacific Bay Properties and Winncrest Homes Inc to Continue Trial Date) filed. (Filed By: Winncrest Homes, Inc.(Cross - Complainant))

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Adult Person With a Disability filed.

Petition to Approve Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Adult Person With a Disability filed. (Filed By: Rowert, Hunter(Petitioner))

Response (Response to Order to Show Cause) filed.

Response (Response to Order to Show Cause) filed. (Filed By: Rowert, Daria(Plaintiff))

275 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 4:00 PM; Event Type: Petition to Approve Compromise of Minors Claim - Minors Compromise; Department: 22; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:15 AM; Event Type: Motion to Continue Hearing - Minors Compromise; Department: 22; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Petition to Approve Compromise of Minors Claim - Minors Compromise; Department: 22; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment; Department: 47; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 43; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:45 AM; Event Type: Petition to Approve Compromise of Minors Claim - Minors Compromise; Department: 22; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
460 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2007
  • Air & Building Sciences, LLC added as a Defendant effective 07/31/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2007
  • Wilson, Elser, Et al added as a Attorney effective 07/31/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2007
  • Webb, Lane E. added as a Attorney effective 07/31/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2007
  • Nunez, Elizabeth A. added as a Attorney effective 07/31/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2007
  • Murphy, Campbell, Et al added as a Attorney effective 07/31/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2007
  • Murphy, George E. added as a Attorney effective 07/31/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2007
  • Palumbo, Bergstrom, LLP added as a Attorney effective 07/31/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2007
  • Bergstrom, Julia L. added as a Attorney effective 07/31/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2007
  • Miller, John C. added as a Attorney effective 07/31/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2007
  • Miller Law, Inc. added as a Attorney effective 07/31/2007 .

    Read MoreRead Less