This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:55:24 (UTC).

Kim Herlache vs. River's Edge Cafe Inc

Case Summary

On 08/26/2015 Kim Herlache filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against River's Edge Cafe Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3544

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Herlache, Kim

Herlache, Tom

Defendants

Does 1-50

River's Edge Cafe Inc

Ryan Riley Adair

Ethan Conrad Properties Inc

Graber Rasmussen Architects Inc

Cross Defendants

Zoes 1-50

Roes 1-50

Adair General Construction

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward A Smith

Steven J Brady

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

James R Donahue

Christopher J Beeman

Douglas G MacKay

Ted D Wood

Dion N. Cominos

Elizabeth O'Brien

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 06/13/2017 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 06/13/2017 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 01/19/2018 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion to Continue Trial - PJ Law and Motion set on 01/19/2018 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/17/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/17/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint) filed. (Filed By: River's Edge Cafe Inc(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (Dec of Michael E Myers) filed.

Declaration - Other (Dec of Michael E Myers) filed. (Filed By: River's Edge Cafe Inc(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to File Cross-Complaint - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/14/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to File Cross-Complaint - Civil Law and Motion heard on 06/14/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Herlache, Kim(Plaintiff))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Adair General Construction(Cross - Complainant))

Motion for Summary Judgment filed.

Motion for Summary Judgment filed. (Filed By: Adair General Construction(Cross - Complainant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of MSJ) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of MSJ) filed. (Filed By: Adair General Construction(Cross - Complainant))

Request - Other (to Appear Telephonically at MSC - GTD) filed.

Request - Other (to Appear Telephonically at MSC - GTD) filed. (Filed By: Graber Rasmussen Architects Inc(Defendant))

Correspondence (RE: Moving MOJs (3) from 5/18/18 to 6/6/18) filed.

Correspondence (RE: Moving MOJs (3) from 5/18/18 to 6/6/18) filed.

Minutes finalized for Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP heard on 05/18/2018 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP heard on 05/18/2018 09:00:00 AM .

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Reply to Opp to MSJ) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Reply to Opp to MSJ) filed. (Filed By: River's Edge Cafe Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.

Minute Order Following Mandatory Settlement Conference filed.

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. (Filed By: Graber Rasmussen Architects Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/05/2018 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion heard on 09/05/2018 09:00:00 AM .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Herlache, Kim(Plaintiff); Herlache, Tom(Plaintiff))

137 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 4:45 PM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 23; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference; Department: 59; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
222 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2016
  • Brady, Steven J added as a effective 03/01/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Herlache, Kim(Plaintiff); Herlache, Tom(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: River's Edge Cafe Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: River's Edge Cafe Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/17/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/27/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Herlache, Kim(Plaintiff); Herlache, Tom(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Herlache, Kim(Plaintiff); Herlache, Tom(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Herlache, Kim(Plaintiff); Herlache, Tom(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less