This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/12/2017 at 04:48:48 (UTC).

Kenneth Smith vs. Sacramento Main County Jail 8 West

Case Summary

On 05/02/2013 Kenneth Smith filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sacramento Main County Jail 8 West. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4314

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH, KENNETH

Defendants

SACRAMENTO MAIN COUNTY JAIL 8 WEST

County of Sacramento

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

John R Whitefleet

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/31/2013 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/31/2013 08:30:00 AM published .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for heard on 05/31/2013 08:46:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 05/31/2013 08:46:00 AM .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Minutes finalized for heard on 05/31/2013 08:46:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 05/31/2013 08:46:00 AM .

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

Demurrer filed.

Demurrer filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Demurrer to Complaint) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Demurrer to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Demurrer to Complaint) filed.

Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Demurrer to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

Reply (to the Failure to Oppose) filed.

Reply (to the Failure to Oppose) filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 02/06/2014 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 02/06/2014 09:00:00 AM .

Order - Other (Order Granting Defendant Demurrer to Complaint) filed.

Order - Other (Order Granting Defendant Demurrer to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

Judgment filed.

Judgment filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed.

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2014
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry - Other (of Order) filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by court .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • Judgment entered .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Order Granting Defendant Demurrer to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 02/06/2014 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for heard on 05/31/2013 08:46:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • The Case Management Conference - Case Management Program is scheduled for 10/31/2013 at 08:30 AM in Department 36.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • This matter is declared not a complex case. Fees ordered refunded to the paying parties upon request.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/31/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 35 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • Designated a complex action on 05/29/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2013
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 05/29/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less