This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/12/2017 at 07:27:31 (UTC).

Kenneth Smith vs. Marshall inn hotel

Case Summary

On 05/16/2013 Kenneth Smith filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Marshall inn hotel. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5025

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SMITH, KENNETH

Defendant

MARSHALL INN HOTEL

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

Summons submitted by Smith, Kenneth rejected on 06/11/2013 .

Summons submitted by Smith, Kenneth rejected on 06/11/2013 . (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for heard on 06/18/2013 08:11:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for heard on 06/18/2013 08:11:00 AM .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2013
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/31/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2013
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for heard on 06/18/2013 08:11:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • The Case Management Conference - Case Management Program is scheduled for 10/31/2013 at 08:30 AM in Department 36.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • This case is reassigned to department 36 for Case Management Conference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • This matter is declared not a complex case. Fees ordered refunded to the paying parties upon request.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2013
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/31/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons submitted by Smith, Kenneth rejected on 06/11/2013 . (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Smith, Kenneth Application for Waiver granted in full on 06/11/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Designated a complex action on 06/11/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • Designated as an exceptional action on 06/11/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 35 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less