Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/15/2017 at 12:31:02 (UTC).

Kenneth Ardell Smith vs. Metro Prole CDC Divisional Unit

Case Summary

On 05/07/2014 Kenneth Ardell Smith filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Metro Prole CDC Divisional Unit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3065

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Smith I, Kenneth Ardell

Defendant

Metro Prole CDC Divisional Unit

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/05/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/05/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Summons submitted by Smith, Kenneth Ardell I rejected on 05/08/2014 .

Summons submitted by Smith, Kenneth Ardell I rejected on 05/08/2014 . (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/05/2015 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/05/2015 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 03/05/2015 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 03/05/2015 08:30:00 AM .

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2015
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 03/05/2015 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2015
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/05/2015 08:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • Smith, Kenneth Ardell I Application for Waiver granted in full on 05/08/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons submitted by Smith, Kenneth Ardell I rejected on 05/08/2014 . (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/05/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Smith, Kenneth(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less