This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/20/2017 at 01:40:38 (UTC).

Kayla Anderson vs. Statewide

Case Summary

On 12/11/2015 Kayla Anderson filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Statewide. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7768

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anderson, William

Anderson, Matthew

Anderson, Laura

Anderson, Sean

Anderson, Kayla

Defendants

Does 1-10

Golosinisky, Ruvim

Statewide

Golosinisky, Vladamir

Domus Construction & Design Inc

Guardian Ad Litem

Anderson, Larry

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joshua T Edlow

Defendant Attorney

Geraldine Barrows

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/21/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/21/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Kayla(Plaintiff); Anderson, Laura(Plaintiff); Anderson, Matthew(Plaintiff); Anderson, Sean(Plaintiff); Anderson, William(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/21/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/21/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Declaration - Other (of Non Conflict by Attorney) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Non Conflict by Attorney) filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Matthew(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Non Conflict by Attorney) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Non Conflict by Attorney) filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Laura(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Laura(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Non Conflict by Attorney) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Non Conflict by Attorney) filed. (Filed By: Anderson, William(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Anderson, William(Plaintiff))

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Larry(Guardian Ad Litem CR))

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Larry(Guardian Ad Litem CR))

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Larry(Guardian Ad Litem CR))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Domus Construction & Design Inc(Defendant); Golosinisky, Ruvim(Defendant); Golosinisky, Vladamir(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Kayla(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Kayla(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Kayla(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Kayla(Plaintiff); Anderson, Laura(Plaintiff); Anderson, Matthew(Plaintiff); Anderson, Sean(Plaintiff); Anderson, William(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Domus Construction & Design Inc(Defendant); Golosinisky, Ruvim(Defendant); Golosinisky, Vladamir(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 07/21/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 07/21/2016 08:30:00 AM .

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 07/21/2016 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2016
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/21/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Domus Construction & Design Inc(Defendant); Golosinisky, Ruvim(Defendant); Golosinisky, Vladamir(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Kayla(Plaintiff); Anderson, Laura(Plaintiff); Anderson, Matthew(Plaintiff); Anderson, Sean(Plaintiff); Anderson, William(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Kayla(Plaintiff); Anderson, Laura(Plaintiff); Anderson, Matthew(Plaintiff); Anderson, Sean(Plaintiff); Anderson, William(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Kayla(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Kayla(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2015
  • Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Laura(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Laura(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (of Non Conflict by Attorney) filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Laura(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Matthew(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Matthew(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (of Non Conflict by Attorney) filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Matthew(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 07/21/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Kayla(Plaintiff); Anderson, Laura(Plaintiff); Anderson, Matthew(Plaintiff); Anderson, Sean(Plaintiff); Anderson, William(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Anderson, Kayla(Plaintiff); Anderson, Laura(Plaintiff); Anderson, Matthew(Plaintiff); Anderson, Sean(Plaintiff); Anderson, William(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less