This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/09/2017 at 19:22:59 (UTC).

Josephine Okwu vs. California Department of Transportation

Case Summary

On 09/13/2012 Josephine Okwu filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against California Department of Transportation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1656

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OKWU, JOSEPHINE

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION

CALIFORNIA PUBLIC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT SYSTEM

KELLER, MARILYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Herman Franck

Defendant Attorney

D Gregory Valenza

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/15/2013 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 08/15/2013 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Okwu, Josephine(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Okwu, Josephine(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Okwu, Josephine(Plaintiff))

Demurrer filed.

Demurrer filed. (Filed By: California Public Employees Retirement System(Defendant))

Demurrer filed.

Demurrer filed. (Filed By: California Department of Transportation(Defendant))

Notice - Other (of Demurrer to Complaint) filed.

Notice - Other (of Demurrer to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: California Department of Transportation(Defendant))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/15/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 08/15/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated .

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: Okwu, Josephine(Plaintiff))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of opp to CA DEPT OF TRANSPORTAIONs demurrer to complaint) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in support of opp to CA DEPT OF TRANSPORTAIONs demurrer to complaint) filed. (Filed By: Okwu, Josephine(Plaintiff))

Reply (Memorandum in Support of Demurrer) filed.

Reply (Memorandum in Support of Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: California Public Employees Retirement System(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 05/09/2013 02:19:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 05/09/2013 02:19:00 PM .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Okwu, Josephine(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Order Granting Demurrer) filed.

Order - Other (Order Granting Demurrer) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (of order) filed.

Notice of Entry - Other (of order) filed. (Filed By: California Department of Transportation(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Okwu, Josephine(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Okwu, Josephine(Plaintiff))

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:27 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:19 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Okwu, Josephine(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 08/15/2013 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: California Department of Transportation(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (of Demurrer to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: California Department of Transportation(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Demurrer filed. (Filed By: California Department of Transportation(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 05/07/2013 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Demurrer to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: California Public Employees Retirement System(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Demurrer filed. (Filed By: California Public Employees Retirement System(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/26/2012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Okwu, Josephine(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Okwu, Josephine(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Okwu, Josephine(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less