Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 13:30:38 (UTC).

JOSEPH MOHAMED SR VS CARROLL J ROGERS. ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/19/2005 JOSEPH MOHAMED SR filed an Other lawsuit against CARROLL J ROGERS. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1697

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2005

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Defendants

Minh, Tran

Li, Sol H.

Kreis, Teresa Elisabeth S

Carlson, Charles R.

Chandler, Gabrielle

Seymour Jr, Fred W.

Minh, Cam

Gollnick, Viola L.

Robarts Family Revocable Trust

Li, Michelle N.

Meier, Richard T.

McNealey, Shirley

Morris, Kaye

Harris Family Revocable Trust

Gollnick, Arthur H.

Chandler, John D.

Meier, Dolores

Rogers, Carroll J.

Underwood, Christina

Dahlin, David

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Keith D Childlaw

Phillip R Bonotto

Steven P Belzer

R Dewey Wheeler

Michael B Read

R Duane Skelton

Other Attorneys

Kevin P Hall

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/05/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/05/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/11/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/11/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/24/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/24/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/07/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/07/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 03/11/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 03/11/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 06/10/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 06/10/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 10/07/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 10/07/2010 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 01/27/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 01/27/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 04/07/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 04/07/2011 08:30:00 AM published .

Request for Judicial Notice (in support of demurrer) filed.

Request for Judicial Notice (in support of demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Carlson, Charles(Defendant); Carlson, Heidy(Defendant); Chandler, Gabrielle(Defendant); Chandler, John(Defendant); Dahlin, David(Defendant); Gollnick, Arthur(Defendant); Gollnick, Viola(Defendant); Harris Family Revocable Trust(Defendant); Kreis, Paul(Defendant); Kreis, Teresa(Defendant); Li, Michelle(Defendant); Li, Sol(Defendant); Minh, Cam(Defendant); Minh, Tran(Defendant); Moore, M(Defendant); Morris, Kaye(Defendant); Robarts Family Revocable Trust(Defendant); Royball Family Revocable Trust(Defendant); Seymour, Fred(Defendant); Seymour, Ritchie(Defendant))

Amended Complaint submitted by Mohamed, Joseph Sr rejected on 04/09/2009 .

Amended Complaint submitted by Mohamed, Joseph Sr rejected on 04/09/2009 . (Filed By: Mohamed, Joseph(Plaintiff))

Request for Judicial Notice filed.

Request for Judicial Notice filed. (Filed By: Carlson, Charles(Defendant); Carlson, Heidy(Defendant))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Moore, M(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (Of Arthur H Gollnick in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint) filed.

Declaration - Other (Of Arthur H Gollnick in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Carlson, Charles(Defendant); Carlson, Heidy(Defendant); Chandler, Gabrielle(Defendant); Chandler, John(Defendant); Dahlin, David(Defendant); Does 1-50(Defendant); Gollnick, Arthur(Defendant); Gollnick, Viola(Defendant); Harris Family Revocable Trust(Defendant); Kreis, Paul(Defendant); Kreis, Teresa(Defendant); Li, Michelle(Defendant); Li, Sol(Defendant); McNealey, Shirley(Defendant); Meier, Dolores(Defendant); Meier, Richard(Defendant); Minh, Cam(Defendant); Minh, Tran(Defendant); Moore, M(Defendant); Morris, Kaye(Defendant))

Mediation Statement filed.

Mediation Statement filed. (Filed By: Carlson, Charles(Defendant); Carlson, Heidy(Defendant))

Requested Continuation of Demurrer Granted

Requested Continuation of Demurrer Granted

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/07/2010 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 01/07/2010 08:30:00 AM .

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program rescheduled to 04/07/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 44 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program rescheduled to 04/07/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 44 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

184 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 44; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
303 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2007
  • McNealey, Shirley added as a Defendant effective 04/19/2005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2007
  • Kreis, Teresa Elisabeth S added as a Defendant effective 04/19/2005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2007
  • Harris Family Revocable Trust added as a Defendant effective 04/19/2005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2007
  • Gregory, Paul added as a Defendant effective 04/19/2005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2007
  • Golnick, Viola L added as a Defendant effective 04/19/2005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2007
  • Gollnick, Arthur H added as a Defendant effective 04/19/2005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2007
  • Carlson, Heidy L added as a Defendant effective 04/19/2005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2007
  • Carlson, Charles R added as a Defendant effective 04/19/2005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2007
  • Mohamed, Joseph Sr added as a Plaintiff effective 04/19/2005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • CMP Packet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALL KEVIN P.