This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/31/2017 at 08:35:31 (UTC).

JOSEPH BEST ET AL VS COUNTY OF SACRAMENTO ET AL

Case Summary

On 08/18/2006 JOSEPH BEST filed an Other lawsuit against COUNTY OF SACRAMENTO. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3542

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Interested Parties

Best, Olivette

Best, Charles

Defendants

Families First

Growing Alteratives Foster Family Agency

Mickey, Ora

Nickerson, Katherine

Kitchen, Jennifer

Joye, Nancy

Johnson, Sylvester

Sandles, Lajuannah

Foster Family Home & Small Family Home Insurance Fund

Shaw, Claudia

Smith, Bette

Swafford, Derek

Fernandez, Patricia

Associated Family Therapy for Effective Recovery

Yang, Phoua

Thurston, Holly

State Department of Social Services

Mancina, Richard

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Interested Party Attorneys

Paul W Leehey

Dennis B Atchley

Donnie R Cox

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas G Minder

John W Bersinger, II

Carol A Wieckowski

Cathleen J Fralick

Douglas A Kroesch

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/17/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/17/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/17/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/17/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/25/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/25/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/25/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/25/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/25/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/25/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/15/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 01/15/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/16/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 07/16/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/17/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/17/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/17/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/17/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Dismissal entered as requested.

Dismissal entered as requested.

Application for Guardian Ad Litem Rejected

Application for Guardian Ad Litem Rejected

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Best, Joseph(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Best, Charles(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: McGowan, Martha(Defendant); Nickerson, Katherine(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Growing Alteratives Foster Family Agency(Defendant))

Stipulation Only - Other (And Order Granting Defendant Growing Alternatives Foster Family Agency Leave To File First Amended Answer) filed.

Stipulation Only - Other (And Order Granting Defendant Growing Alternatives Foster Family Agency Leave To File First Amended Answer) filed. (Filed By: Growing Alteratives Foster Family Agency(Defendant))

Notice of Hearing filed.

Notice of Hearing filed. (Filed By: Best, Joseph(Plaintiff); Best, Olivette(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Best, Joseph(Plaintiff))

92 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:30 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Minors Compromise; Department: 17; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 43; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 11:00 AM; Event Type: Petition to Approve Compromise of Minors Claim - Minors Compromise; Department: 17; Status: Scheduled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Pay Sanctions - Case Management Program; Department: 43; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Trial; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to Appear - Case Management Program; Department: 5; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 5; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Growing Alteratives Foster Family Agency(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2010
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/25/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2010
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/25/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 35 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice to File Dismissal and/or Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
190 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2008
  • Yang, Phoua added as a Defendant effective 08/18/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • Oleachea, Barbara added as a Defendant effective 08/18/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • Sandles, Lajuannah added as a Defendant effective 08/18/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • Fernandez, Patricia added as a Defendant effective 08/18/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • Thurston, Holly added as a Defendant effective 08/18/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • Best, Serenity added as a Plaintiff effective 08/18/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • Best, Joseph added as a Plaintiff effective 08/18/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • Best, Olivette added as a Plaintiff effective 08/18/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2008
  • Best, Charles added as a Plaintiff effective 08/18/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2007
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/21/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less