This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/19/2017 at 19:19:36 (UTC).

Jose Alvarado vs. Ferrari Moe LLP

Case Summary

On 11/09/2015 Jose Alvarado filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Ferrari Moe LLP. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6495

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alvarado, Jose

Defendants

Deacon Corp

Does 1-20

Ferrari Moe LLP

Sutterview Housing Associates LLC

Does 4-20

Winfield Hill Inc

Sutterview Housing Associates LP

Cross Defendant

Moes 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hank G Greenblatt

Defendant Attorneys

John V O'Meara

Jill Eileen Latchaw

Paul D Caleo

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Demurrer filed.

Demurrer filed. (Filed By: Ferrari Moe LLP(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (Dec of Jill H Latchaw) filed.

Declaration - Other (Dec of Jill H Latchaw) filed. (Filed By: Ferrari Moe LLP(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 02/29/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 02/29/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Deacon Corp(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: Deacon Corp(Cross - Complainant))

Summons (Amended) filed.

Summons (Amended) filed. (Filed By: Alvarado, Jose(Plaintiff))

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed. (Filed By: Deacon Corp(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Alvarado, Jose(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Sutterview Housing Associates LLC(Defendant); Sutterview Housing Associates LP(Defendant); Winfield Hill Inc(Defendant))

Declaration - Other (of Drew Sense in Support of MSJ) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Drew Sense in Support of MSJ) filed. (Filed By: Deacon Corp(Defendant))

Notice - Other (of Non-Receipt of Opp to MSJ) filed.

Notice - Other (of Non-Receipt of Opp to MSJ) filed. (Filed By: Deacon Corp(Defendant))

Proposed Order (Granting Defs MSJ) filed.

Proposed Order (Granting Defs MSJ) filed. (Filed By: Deacon Corp(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP heard on 01/26/2017 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP heard on 01/26/2017 02:00:00 PM .

Judgment filed.

Judgment filed.

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Alvarado, Jose(Plaintiff))

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 30; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Alvarado, Jose(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • Judgment entered .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. (Filed By: Deacon Corp(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Judgment filed. (Filed By: Deacon Corp(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order - Other (Order Granting Motion for Summary Judgment) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. (Filed By: Deacon Corp(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Demurrer filed. (Filed By: Ferrari Moe LLP(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • Latchaw, Jill Eileen added as a effective 01/13/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Alvarado, Jose(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Alvarado, Jose(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 11/09/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Alvarado, Jose(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Alvarado, Jose(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Alvarado, Jose(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less