Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/15/2017 at 22:23:35 (UTC).

Jonathan Asselin-Normand vs. BHRIJ Hospitality LLC

Case Summary

On 07/14/2014 Jonathan Asselin-Normand filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against BHRIJ Hospitality LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6291

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Asselin-Normand, Jonathan

Defendants

BHRIJ Hospitality LLC

Does 1-100

Sarang, Hasamukh

Sarang, Pratibha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Calvin Chang

Defendant Attorney

William C Rolfe

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

Summons submitted by Asselin-Normand, Jonathan rejected on 07/22/2014 .

Summons submitted by Asselin-Normand, Jonathan rejected on 07/22/2014 . (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

Complaint - Doe Amendment (DOE 1 & 2) filed.

Complaint - Doe Amendment (DOE 1 & 2) filed. (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Sarang, Hasamukh(Defendant); Sarang, Pratibha(Defendant))

Amended Answer filed.

Amended Answer filed. (Filed By: Sarang, Hasamukh(Defendant); Sarang, Pratibha(Defendant))

Compromise - Offer and Acceptance filed.

Compromise - Offer and Acceptance filed. (Filed By: Sarang, Hasamukh(Defendant); Sarang, Hasamukh(Defendant))

Compromise - Offer and Acceptance submitted by Sarang, Hasamukh; Sarang, Pratibha rejected on 10/28/2014 .

Compromise - Offer and Acceptance submitted by Sarang, Hasamukh; Sarang, Pratibha rejected on 10/28/2014 . (Filed By: Sarang, Hasamukh(Defendant); Sarang, Pratibha(Defendant))

Compromise - Offer and Acceptance filed.

Compromise - Offer and Acceptance filed. (Filed By: Sarang, Hasamukh(Defendant); Sarang, Pratibha(Defendant))

Proposed Judgment filed.

Proposed Judgment filed. (Filed By: Sarang, Hasamukh(Defendant); Sarang, Pratibha(Defendant))

Judgment (Stipulated Judgment) filed.

Judgment (Stipulated Judgment) filed.

Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed.

Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed. (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed. (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Judgment entered .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment (Stipulated Judgment) filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proposed Judgment filed. (Filed By: Sarang, Hasamukh(Defendant); Sarang, Pratibha(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Compromise - Offer and Acceptance filed. (Filed By: Sarang, Hasamukh(Defendant); Sarang, Pratibha(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Compromise - Offer and Acceptance submitted by Sarang, Hasamukh; Sarang, Pratibha rejected on 10/28/2014 . (Filed By: Sarang, Hasamukh(Defendant); Sarang, Pratibha(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Compromise - Offer and Acceptance filed. (Filed By: Sarang, Hasamukh(Defendant); Sarang, Hasamukh(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Answer filed. (Filed By: Sarang, Hasamukh(Defendant); Sarang, Pratibha(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Sarang, Hasamukh(Defendant); Sarang, Pratibha(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint - Doe Amendment (DOE 1 & 2) filed. (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Sarang, Pratibha added as a Defendant effective 07/22/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Sarang, Hasamukh added as a Defendant effective 07/22/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • Summons submitted by Asselin-Normand, Jonathan rejected on 07/22/2014 . (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons submitted by Asselin-Normand, Jonathan rejected on 07/22/2014 . (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 07/15/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Asselin-Normand, Jonathan(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less