This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/12/2017 at 21:56:02 (UTC).

John Chiang In His Official Capacity as Controller of the State of California vs. Kemper Corporation

Case Summary

On 07/17/2013 John Chiang In His Official Capacity as Controller of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Kemper Corporation. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8154

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOHN CHIANG IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS CONTROLLER OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

OFFICE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

Office of the State Controller

Defendants

DOES 1-25

KEMPER CORPORATION

MUTUAL SAVINGS LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, AN ALABAMA CORPORATION

RELIABLE LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, AN OKLAHOMA CORPORATION

RESERVE NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, A MISSOURI CORPORATION

UNION NATIONAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, A LOUISIANA CORPORATION

UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, AN ILLINIOIS CORPORATION

UNITRIN INC

Cross Defendants

Verus Financial LLC

Betty T. Yee in her official capacity as the Controller of the State of California and the Office of the State Controller of California

California Insurance Department

Dave Jones, in his official capacity as Insurance Commissioner

Not Classified By Court

Brazil, Wayne D.

West, Carl J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard J. Chivaro

Defendant Attorney

Carol Lynn Thompson

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Deborah Rosenthal

Marc S Cohen

Steven J Green

Serajul F. Ali

Jill Bowers

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 11/15/2013 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 11/15/2013 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/06/2014 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/06/2014 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Status Conference - Complex set on 03/06/2015 10:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Status Conference - Complex set on 03/06/2015 10:00:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Status Conference - Complex set on 06/25/2015 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Status Conference - Complex set on 06/25/2015 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 10/14/2015 09:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion - Other - PJ Law and Motion set on 10/14/2015 09:30:00 AM published .

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: John Chiang In His Official Capacity as Controller of the State of California(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: John Chiang In His Official Capacity as Controller of the State of California(Plaintiff); United Insurance Company of America, an Illiniois Corporation(Cross - Complainant))

Recommendation and Order of Discovery Referee filed.

Recommendation and Order of Discovery Referee filed.

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 05/19/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 05/19/2015 09:00:00 AM .

Objection (and Motion to Strike Declarations Submitted in Support of Preliminary Injunction) filed.

Objection (and Motion to Strike Declarations Submitted in Support of Preliminary Injunction) filed. (Filed By: Reliable Life Insurance Company, an Oklahoma Corporation(Defendant); Reserve National Insurance Company, A Missouri Corporation(Defendant); United Insurance Company of America, an Illiniois Corporation(Defendant))

Proposed Order (Report & Recommendation Re: Disposition of Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony) filed.

Proposed Order (Report & Recommendation Re: Disposition of Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony) filed. (Filed By: John Chiang In His Official Capacity as Controller of the State of California(Plaintiff); Office of the State Controller(Plaintiff))

Declaration - Other (of Caroline Marshall in Support of Motion) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Caroline Marshall in Support of Motion) filed. (Filed By: Betty T. Yee in her official capacity as the Controller of the State of California and the Office of the State Controller of California(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Betty T. Yee in her official capacity as the Controller of the State of California and the Office of the State Controller of California(Plaintiff))

Motion - Other (to Seal Confidential Information) filed.

Motion - Other (to Seal Confidential Information) filed. (Filed By: Reliable Life Insurance Company, an Oklahoma Corporation(Defendant); Reserve National Insurance Company, A Missouri Corporation(Defendant); United Insurance Company of America, an Illiniois Corporation(Defendant))

Order Appointing Discovery Referee filed.

Order Appointing Discovery Referee filed.

Paper Exhibits (Exhibit DD, EE, FF, GG, HH, II, JJ, to the Declaration of Carol Lynn Thompson in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Adjudication) filed.

Paper Exhibits (Exhibit DD, EE, FF, GG, HH, II, JJ, to the Declaration of Carol Lynn Thompson in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Adjudication) filed. (Filed By: Reliable Life Insurance Company, an Oklahoma Corporation(Defendant); Reserve National Insurance Company, A Missouri Corporation(Defendant); United Insurance Company of America, an Illiniois Corporation(Defendant))

Objection (Redacted) filed.

Objection (Redacted) filed. (Filed By: Reserve National Insurance Company, A Missouri Corporation(Defendant); United Insurance Company of America, an Illiniois Corporation(Defendant))

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Staying Discovery and Continuing Trial Date) filed.

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order Staying Discovery and Continuing Trial Date) filed.

719 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Reconsideration - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Reconsideration - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 12:14 PM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Application for Order Sealing Record - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
951 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: John Chiang In His Official Capacity as Controller of the State of California(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Reliable Life Insurance Company, an Oklahoma Corporation(Defendant); Reserve National Insurance Company, A Missouri Corporation(Defendant); United Insurance Company of America, an Illiniois Corporation(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Response (to Notice of Ralated Case) filed. (Filed By: Reliable Life Insurance Company, an Oklahoma Corporation(Defendant); Reserve National Insurance Company, A Missouri Corporation(Defendant); United Insurance Company of America, an Illiniois Corporation(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: John Chiang In His Official Capacity as Controller of the State of California(Plaintiff); Office of the State Controller(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/06/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2013
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/06/2013 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Related Case filed. (Filed By: John Chiang In His Official Capacity as Controller of the State of California(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: John Chiang In His Official Capacity as Controller of the State of California(Plaintiff); Office of the State Controller(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: John Chiang In His Official Capacity as Controller of the State of California(Plaintiff); Office of the State Controller(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less