This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/09/2017 at 17:34:53 (UTC).

Joel Young vs. Michael Morgan

Case Summary

On 09/05/2012 Joel Young filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Michael Morgan. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1253

  • Filing Date:

    09/05/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOUNG, JOEL

Defendants

MORGAN, MICHAEL

PIZZA GUYS FRANCHISES INC

Does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Julie A Doumit

Defendant Attorney

Matthew J Ruggles

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Young, Joel(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Young, Joel(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Young, Joel(Plaintiff))

Certificate of Service filed.

Certificate of Service filed. (Filed By: Young, Joel(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Pizza Guys Franchises Inc(Defendant))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/07/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/07/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Young, Joel(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Pizza Guys Franchises Inc(Defendant))

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/07/2013 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 03/07/2013 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 03/07/2013 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 03/07/2013 08:30:00 AM .

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Young, Joel(Plaintiff))

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed.

Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Pizza Guys Franchises Inc(Defendant))

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2013
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 39; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Pizza Guys Franchises Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • TSP Referral - Clock Start Calendar scheduled for 11/21/2013 at 09:00:00 PM in Department CV_UNIT at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2013
  • Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Young, Joel(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 03/07/2013 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2013
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Pizza Guys Franchises Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Young, Joel(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 03/07/2013 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Pizza Guys Franchises Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service filed. (Filed By: Young, Joel(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/22/2012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Young, Joel(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Young, Joel(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Young, Joel(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less