Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 09/21/2020 at 20:59:40 (UTC).

Jenrry G Rivera vs. Jayaraman Venkitu

Case Summary

On 12/16/2014 Jenrry G Rivera filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Jayaraman Venkitu. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2935

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rivera, Jenrry G.

Defendants

Does 1-10

Venkitu, Jayaraman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Xavier Villegas

Defendant Attorney

Derek C Decker

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Rivera, Jenrry(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Rivera, Jenrry(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Rivera, Jenrry(Plaintiff))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Rivera, Jenrry(Plaintiff); Venkitu, Jayaraman(Defendant))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/12/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/12/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Rivera, Jenrry(Plaintiff))

Answer submitted by Venkitu, Jayaraman rejected on 02/03/2015 .

Answer submitted by Venkitu, Jayaraman rejected on 02/03/2015 . (Filed By: Venkitu, Jayaraman(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Venkitu, Jayaraman(Defendant))

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. (Filed By: Rivera, Jenrry(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Rivera, Jenrry(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2015
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/12/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Rivera, Jenrry(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2015
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. (Filed By: Rivera, Jenrry(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed. (Filed By: Venkitu, Jayaraman(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer submitted by Venkitu, Jayaraman rejected on 02/03/2015 . (Filed By: Venkitu, Jayaraman(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Rivera, Jenrry(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Rivera, Jenrry(Plaintiff); Venkitu, Jayaraman(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • DocketRivera, Jenrry G Application for Waiver granted in full on 12/17/2014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • DocketRivera, Jenrry G Application for Waiver granted in full on 12/17/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 11/12/2015 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Rivera, Jenrry(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Rivera, Jenrry(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Rivera, Jenrry(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DECKER DEREK C.