This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/01/2017 at 14:28:59 (UTC).

Jennifer Hartwich vs. Medical Vision Technology

Case Summary

On 10/12/2006 Jennifer Hartwich filed an Other lawsuit against Medical Vision Technology. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4370

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2006

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Herrera, Lisa

Roth, Tim

Robertson, Trish

Nugent, Jeanne

Jones, Linda

Nero, Kim

Strawmier, Donna

Jennifer Hartwich on behalf of all others similarly situated

Hartwich, Jennifer

Defendants

DOES 1-10

Medical Vision Technology Opthamology Group Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter F Samuel

Defendant Attorney

Robert B Zaro

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Motion Re: Case Management Program (CMP) - Case Management Program set on 03/27/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Motion Re: Case Management Program (CMP) - Case Management Program set on 03/27/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/25/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 09/25/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/06/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 11/06/2008 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/23/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/23/2009 08:30:00 AM published .

Motion to Redesignate filed.

Motion to Redesignate filed. (Filed By: Hartwich, Jennifer(Plaintiff))

Joint Case Management Order

Joint Case Management Order

Ex Parte Application/Stipulation (CMP) - Other (to Vacate the Mandatory Settlement Conference & Trial Dates) filed.

Ex Parte Application/Stipulation (CMP) - Other (to Vacate the Mandatory Settlement Conference & Trial Dates) filed. (Filed By: Medical Vision Technology Opthamology Group Inc(Defendant))

Returned Document Form - Re: Stipulation to Vacate the Mandatory Settlement Conference & Trial Dates, etc.

Returned Document Form - Re: Stipulation to Vacate the Mandatory Settlement Conference & Trial Dates, etc.

Declaration - Other (Dec of Robert R Peabody Jr in Opp to Motion) filed.

Declaration - Other (Dec of Robert R Peabody Jr in Opp to Motion) filed. (Filed By: Medical Vision Technology Opthamology Group Inc(Defendant))

Notice - Other (AMENDED Notice of Motion to Certify Class) filed.

Notice - Other (AMENDED Notice of Motion to Certify Class) filed. (Filed By: Hartwich, Jennifer(Plaintiff))

Reply - Other (in support) filed.

Reply - Other (in support) filed. (Filed By: Hartwich, Jennifer(Plaintiff))

Amended Complaint filed.

Amended Complaint filed. (Filed By: Hartwich, Jennifer(Plaintiff); Herrera, Lisa(Plaintiff); Jennifer Hartwich on behalf of all others similarly situated(Plaintiff); Jones, Linda(Plaintiff); Nero, Kim(Plaintiff); Nugent, Jeanne(Plaintiff); Robertson, Trish(Plaintiff); Roth, Tim(Plaintiff); Strawmier, Donna(Plaintiff))

Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class

Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Class

Declaration - Other (Of Robert F Samuel in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time) filed.

Declaration - Other (Of Robert F Samuel in Support of Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time) filed. (Filed By: Hartwich, Jennifer(Plaintiff))

Stipulation and Order Allowing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint

Stipulation and Order Allowing Plaintiff to File Second Amended Complaint

Order Determining Disposition of Ex parte Application

Order Determining Disposition of Ex parte Application

Declaration - Other (of P F Sanuel in support) filed.

Declaration - Other (of P F Sanuel in support) filed. (Filed By: Medical Vision Technology Opthamology Group Inc(Defendant))

Order - Other (Order For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement) filed.

Order - Other (Order For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement) filed.

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2011
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Compel - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 3:11 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2010
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 3:09 PM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
222 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2008
  • Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 04/07/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 44 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2008
  • Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 04/07/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 44 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2008
  • Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 04/29/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address filed. (Filed By: Medical Vision Technology Opthamology Group Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2007
  • Trial Setting Conference - Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 01/22/2008 at 10:00:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2007
  • Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 01/29/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2007
  • Case assigned to Department 39 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2007
  • Medical Vision Technology Opthamology Group Inc added as a Defendant effective 10/12/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2007
  • Hartwich, Jennifer added as a Plaintiff effective 10/12/2006 .

    Read MoreRead Less