This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/19/2017 at 16:50:56 (UTC).

Jean Marc Van den Heuvel vs. California State Contractors License Board

Case Summary

On 11/02/2015 Jean Marc Van den Heuvel filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against California State Contractors License Board. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6253

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Van den Heuvel, Jean Marc

Defendants

California State Contractors License Board

Does 1-6

Hoefling, Sharon

Hoefling, John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

James C Phillips

Edward F Cullen

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 06/09/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

Demurrer (to Complaint) filed.

Demurrer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: California State Contractors License Board(Defendant))

Request - Entry of Default filed.

Request - Entry of Default filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

Default denied as to California State Contractors License Board on Complaint .

Default denied as to California State Contractors License Board on Complaint .

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Demurrer) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Opposition to Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

Reply (Unserved Opposition to Demurrer) filed.

Reply (Unserved Opposition to Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: California State Contractors License Board(Defendant))

Opposition (to Demurrer) filed.

Opposition (to Demurrer) filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 02/01/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 02/01/2016 02:00:00 PM .

Amended Complaint filed.

Amended Complaint filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

Amended Complaint filed.

Amended Complaint filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

Exhibit List (Plfs relative Exhibits Showing Scheduled Causes of Action in Orders Showing Unjust Injury) filed.

Exhibit List (Plfs relative Exhibits Showing Scheduled Causes of Action in Orders Showing Unjust Injury) filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2016
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 30; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DocketPast Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice - Other (Notice of Relevant Unjust Further Injuries from Present Conditions of Unjust Recovations of Contractor's License in 2007) filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence (Plaintiff Submissions of Injuries Related to the Unjust Revocation of Contractors License 771-545) filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEstimated Costs of Clerks Transcript on Appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (Petition for Relieffs in the Superior COurts Government Code Section 945.4) filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2015
  • DocketHearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP scheduled for 02/01/2016 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer (to Complaint) filed. (Filed By: California State Contractors License Board(Defendant))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) (Granted) filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2015
  • DocketVan den Heuvel, Jean Marc Application for Waiver granted in full on 11/06/2015 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 06/09/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 39 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Van den Heuvel, Jean(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James C Phillips

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CULLEN, EDWARD FRANCIS