This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/18/2017 at 16:02:37 (UTC).

Janet Borchman vs. California Service Bureau Inc

Case Summary

On 07/27/2015 Janet Borchman filed an Other lawsuit against California Service Bureau Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2285

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Borchman, Janet

Defendants

California Service Bureau Inc

Does 1-20

Law Offices of Michael K Sipes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd M Friedman

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Borchman, Janet(Plaintiff))

Notice of Settlement filed.

Notice of Settlement filed. (Filed By: Borchman, Janet(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Borchman, Janet(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Borchman, Janet(Plaintiff))

Demand for Jury Trial filed.

Demand for Jury Trial filed. (Filed By: Borchman, Janet(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Borchman, Janet(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Borchman, Janet(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Borchman, Janet(Plaintiff))

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2016
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Borchman, Janet(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Settlement filed. (Filed By: Borchman, Janet(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Borchman, Janet(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Borchman, Janet(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2015
  • DocketSummons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 07/28/2015 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed. (Filed By: Borchman, Janet(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Borchman, Janet(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons filed. (Filed By: Borchman, Janet(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed. (Filed By: Borchman, Janet(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less