This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 07:45:38 (UTC).

Jamie Miller vs. Beazer Homes Holdings Corp

Case Summary

On 08/16/2017 Jamie Miller filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Beazer Homes Holdings Corp. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7549

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Feng, Yingjue

Miller, Jamie

Brock, Julian

Jones, Mierra

Brown, Alan

Brock, Ramana

Zhao, Qi

Defendants

Does 1-100

Beazer Homes Holdings Corp

Beazer Homes Holdings LLC

Cross Defendants

CVC Construction Corp

Walldesign Inc

Michael Hopper Construction Inc

Metropolitan Interior Designs

Associated Material Incorporated

Teeters Electric Inc

Mark Scangarella Painting

Eds Fence Inc

Villara Corporation

Allstate Contract Flooring

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Antonina C. Lococo

Antonina C LoCoco

Defendant Attorneys

Robert B Titus

Daniel J Brast

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Cheryl A Kirkpatrick

Stacy Melville Moak

Other Attorneys

James William Rushford

John J Wasinda

George K Milionis

Hasan B Shaik

Timothy C McNeill

Tamara A Laskin

Katie L Coy

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 08/08/2019 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 08/08/2019 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/06/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 12/06/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/19/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/19/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/15/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 02/15/2018 08:30:00 AM published .

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Beazer Homes Holdings LLC(Cross - Complainant))

Order - Other (setting OSC RE: Dismissal for 8/8/2019) filed.

Order - Other (setting OSC RE: Dismissal for 8/8/2019) filed.

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: General Construction Works Inc(Cross - Defendant); Pete Jenson Pinnacle Construction Inc(Cross - Defendant); Pete Jenson Pinnacle Construction Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Order - Other (on Case Management Conference Continuance) filed.

Order - Other (on Case Management Conference Continuance) filed. (Filed By: Dekker, Peter(Special Master))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: CVC Construction Corp(Cross - Complainant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Beazer Homes Holdings LLC(Cross - Complainant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Beazer Homes Holdings LLC(Cross - Complainant))

Notice - Other (JR Pierce Plumbing Co, Inc of Sacramento notice of opting out of mediatory/special master and ex parte processes) filed.

Notice - Other (JR Pierce Plumbing Co, Inc of Sacramento notice of opting out of mediatory/special master and ex parte processes) filed. (Filed By: JR Pierce Plumbing Company., Inc of Sacramento(Cross - Defendant))

Answer (of Petersen-Dean Inc to Second Amendment of Beazer Homes Holdings LLC) filed.

Answer (of Petersen-Dean Inc to Second Amendment of Beazer Homes Holdings LLC) filed. (Filed By: Peterson Dean Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Associated Materials LLC(Cross - Defendant))

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed.

Proof of Service - PERSONAL filed. (Filed By: Beazer Homes Holdings LLC(Cross - Complainant))

Amended Cross-Complaint (2nd Amended Cross Complaint of Beazer Homes Holdings Corp) filed.

Amended Cross-Complaint (2nd Amended Cross Complaint of Beazer Homes Holdings Corp) filed. (Filed By: Beazer Homes Holdings LLC(Cross - Complainant))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/15/2018 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 02/15/2018 08:30:00 AM .

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order of Reference to Special Master) filed.

Order - Other (Stipulation and Order of Reference to Special Master) filed.

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program; Department: 23; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 23; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 23; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 2:00 PM; Event Type: Motion to File Amended Complaint - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 53; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minute Order) generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program heard on 08/08/2019 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • The Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program is scheduled for 10/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Department 23.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/17/2019 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 23 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Order to Show Cause in RE: Dismissal has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Case Management Program set on 08/08/2019 08:30:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Beazer Homes Holdings LLC(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
158 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Beazer Homes Holdings LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation and Order - Other (of Reference to Special Master) submitted by Dekker, Peter rejected on 10/26/2017 . (Filed By: Dekker, Peter(Special Master))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • Dekker, Peter added as a Special Master effective 10/18/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Miller, Jamie(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 02/15/2018 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 30 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • Case assigned to Department 30 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2017
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 08/17/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Brock, Julian(Plaintiff); Brock, Ramana(Plaintiff); Brown, Alan(Plaintiff); Feng, Yingjue(Plaintiff); Jones, Mierra(Plaintiff); Miller, Jamie(Plaintiff); Zhao, Qi(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Brock, Julian(Plaintiff); Brock, Ramana(Plaintiff); Brown, Alan(Plaintiff); Feng, Yingjue(Plaintiff); Jones, Mierra(Plaintiff); Miller, Jamie(Plaintiff); Zhao, Qi(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Brock, Julian(Plaintiff); Brock, Ramana(Plaintiff); Brown, Alan(Plaintiff); Feng, Yingjue(Plaintiff); Jones, Mierra(Plaintiff); Miller, Jamie(Plaintiff); Zhao, Qi(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Metropolitan Interior Designs is a litigant

Latest cases where Cvc Construction Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Associated Materials, LLC, a limited liability company is a litigant