This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/08/2017 at 12:53:47 (UTC).

James Ignacio vs. JTS Communities Inc

Case Summary

On 05/08/2008 James Ignacio filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against JTS Communities Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0488

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Okoro, Charles

Okoro, Caroline

Derden, Walter

Bozzo, Steve

Vidanes, Jeffrey

Lambert, Lisa

Ignacio, James

Martin, Lori

Cross Defendants

Sacramento A-1 Door

Old Country Roofing

Beutler Corporation

Vaca Valley Roofing

Moes 1-50

Energetic Painting and Drywall Inc

Brazil Quality Roofing

Roes 5 to 500

Procida Landscape

Signature Drywall Inc

H&D Electric INC

Northstar Plumbing

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard P Riley

Cross Defendant Attorneys

Karen L Jacobsen

J Scott Donald

John E Riddle

Scott M Hutchison

Justin J McKenna

Susan H Rapp

James W Doran

Other Attorneys

A Raymond Hamrick, III

James R Donahue

Matthew Salazar

Dan S. Demund

Paul A Herp

 

Court Documents

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: JTS Communities Inc(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: JTS Communities Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 08/15/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP heard on 08/15/2008 09:00:00 AM .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: JTS Communities Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/04/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/04/2008 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 39 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Notice - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice of Case Management Conference) filed. (Filed By: Ignacio, James(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: H&D Electric INC(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Energetic Painting and Drywall Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Stipulation and Proposed Case Management Order No. 1

Stipulation and Proposed Case Management Order No. 1

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Beutler Corporation(Cross - Defendant))

Notice - Other (Of Filing Proof of Personal Service) filed.

Notice - Other (Of Filing Proof of Personal Service) filed. (Filed By: Atmos Corporation(Cross - Complainant))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Beutler Corporation(Cross - Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: MWB Building Contractors Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement submitted by Procida Landscape rejected on 07/06/2009 .

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement submitted by Procida Landscape rejected on 07/06/2009 . (Filed By: Procida Landscape(Cross - Defendant))

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed.

Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement filed. (Filed By: Procida Landscape(Cross - Defendant))

Association of Attorney filed.

Association of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Alliance Building Products Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Association of Attorney filed.

Association of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Alliance Building Products Inc(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Alliance Building Products Inc(Cross - Defendant))

120 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 1:30 PM; Event Type: Status Conference - Civil Special Sets; Department: 30; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Determination of Good Faith Settlement; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 11:00 AM; Event Type: Status Conference - Civil Special Sets; Department: 30; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2009
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 10:00 AM; Event Type: Motion - Other - Civil Special Sets; Department: 30; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion to Strike - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2008
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Hearing on Demurrer - Civil Law and Motion - Demurrer/JOP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: JTS Communities Inc(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Alliance Building Products Inc(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
206 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2008
  • Lambert, Lisa added as a Plaintiff effective 05/08/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2008
  • Lambert, Don added as a Plaintiff effective 05/08/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2008
  • Derden, Sharon added as a Plaintiff effective 05/08/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2008
  • Derden, Walter added as a Plaintiff effective 05/08/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2008
  • Does 1-500 added as a Defendant effective 05/08/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2008
  • Designated a complex action on 05/08/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Bozzo, Steve(Plaintiff); Derden, Sharon(Plaintiff); Derden, Walter(Plaintiff); Ignacio, James(Plaintiff); Ignacio, Nancy(Plaintiff); Lambert, Don(Plaintiff); Lambert, Lisa(Plaintiff); Martin, Lori(Plaintiff); Okoro, Caroline(Plaintiff); Okoro, Charles(Plaintiff); Pugeda, Serena(Plaintiff); Vidanes, Jeffrey(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Ignacio, James(Plaintiff); Ignacio, Nancy(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Bozzo, Steve(Plaintiff); Derden, Sharon(Plaintiff); Derden, Walter(Plaintiff); Ignacio, James(Plaintiff); Ignacio, Nancy(Plaintiff); Lambert, Don(Plaintiff); Lambert, Lisa(Plaintiff); Martin, Lori(Plaintiff); Okoro, Caroline(Plaintiff); Okoro, Charles(Plaintiff); Pugeda, Serena(Plaintiff); Vidanes, Jeffrey(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2008
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 05/08/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vaca Valley Roffing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Sacramento A-1 Door is a litigant

Latest cases where BEUTLER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Energetic Painting and Drywall Inc is a litigant