This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/19/2017 at 06:33:21 (UTC).

James Covey vs. State of California

Case Summary

On 09/17/2015 James Covey filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against State of California. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4408

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Covey, James

Covey, Rita

Defendants

City of Sacramento

County of Sacramento

Does 1-50

State of California

California Department Of Transportation

Cross Defendants

Schaller, Mitchell Steven

Moes 1-10

CC Myers Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott D Righthand

Defendant Attorneys

James Sanchez

Jennifer K Stinnett

Jeffrey B Knox

James Henry Olson

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/21/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/21/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Covey, James(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Covey, James(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Covey, James(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: California Department Of Transportation(Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: California Department Of Transportation(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/21/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/21/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Notice of Lodging (of Exhibits) filed.

Notice of Lodging (of Exhibits) filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Request for Dismissal filed.

Request for Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Covey, James(Plaintiff))

Notice - Other (of taking motion for summary judgment off calendar) filed.

Notice - Other (of taking motion for summary judgment off calendar) filed. (Filed By: City of Sacramento(Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP heard on 10/21/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP heard on 10/21/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed. (Filed By: California Department Of Transportation(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint submitted by California Department Of Transportation rejected on 02/16/2017 .

Cross-Complaint submitted by California Department Of Transportation rejected on 02/16/2017 . (Filed By: California Department Of Transportation(Defendant))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: California Department Of Transportation(Cross - Complainant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: California Department Of Transportation(Cross - Complainant))

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Adjudication - Civil Law and Motion - MSA/MSJ/SLAPP; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 9:00 AM; Event Type: Motion for Attorney Fees - Civil Law and Motion; Department: 54; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: California Department Of Transportation(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: California Department Of Transportation(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: California Department Of Transportation(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: California Department Of Transportation(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: California Department Of Transportation(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • Moes 1-10 added as a Cross - Defendant effective 02/21/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • CC Myers Inc added as a Cross - Defendant effective 02/21/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Covey, James(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/21/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/18/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Covey, James(Plaintiff); Covey, Rita(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Covey, James(Plaintiff); Covey, Rita(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Covey, James(Plaintiff); Covey, Rita(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Covey, James(Plaintiff); Covey, Rita(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Covey, James(Plaintiff); Covey, Rita(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Covey, James(Plaintiff); Covey, Rita(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less