This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/19/2017 at 06:34:34 (UTC).

Jacquiline Oester vs. County of Sacramento

Case Summary

On 09/17/2015 Jacquiline Oester filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against County of Sacramento. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4444

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oester, Jacquiline

Defendants

Chuema, Chandan D.

Chuema, Mandeep

County of Sacramento

Does 1-25

Mercy Court LLC

Mercy Court Associates LLC

Cheema, Mandeep

Cheema, Chandan D.

Cross Defendants

Huang, Elsie

Roes 1-50

Kaileth, Elizabeth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas J Johnston

Defendant Attorneys

Carol A Wieckowski

Craig A Caldwell

Keith R Pawloski

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/21/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 04/21/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Oester, Jacquiline(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Oester, Jacquiline(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/21/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/21/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Oester, Jacquiline(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Mercy Court Associates LLC(Defendant))

Notice - Other (Of Filing POS) filed.

Notice - Other (Of Filing POS) filed. (Filed By: Oester, Jacquiline(Plaintiff))

Request for Dismissal - Cause(s) of Action (Second Cause of Action for Negligence against defendant County of Sacrament only) filed.

Request for Dismissal - Cause(s) of Action (Second Cause of Action for Negligence against defendant County of Sacrament only) filed. (Filed By: Oester, Jacquiline(Plaintiff))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: County of Sacramento(Cross - Complainant))

Answer (to Cross Complaint) filed.

Answer (to Cross Complaint) filed. (Filed By: Mercy Court Associates LLC(Cross - Defendant))

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed.

Notice of Change of Address/Telephone No. filed. (Filed By: Oester, Jacquiline(Plaintiff))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Cheema, Chandan(Cross - Defendant); Cheema, Mandeep(Cross - Defendant))

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Mercy Court Associates LLC(Cross - Defendant))

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed. (Filed By: Oester, Jacquiline(Plaintiff))

Answer (to Cross Complaint of City of Sacramento) filed.

Answer (to Cross Complaint of City of Sacramento) filed. (Filed By: Cheema, Chandan(Cross - Defendant); Cheema, Mandeep(Cross - Defendant))

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/21/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/21/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed.

Notice of Change of Firm Name filed. (Filed By: Cheema, Chandan(Cross - Defendant); Cheema, Mandeep(Cross - Defendant))

Notice of Trial (and Mandatory Settlement Conference Dates) filed.

Notice of Trial (and Mandatory Settlement Conference Dates) filed. (Filed By: Oester, Jacquiline(Plaintiff))

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Trial (and Mandatory Settlement Conference Dates) filed. (Filed By: Oester, Jacquiline(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 07/17/2017 at 01:30:00 PM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 08/21/2017 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Pawloski, Keith R added as a effective 11/10/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change in Handling Attorney filed. (Filed By: Cheema, Chandan(Defendant); Cheema, Mandeep(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Firm Name filed. (Filed By: Cheema, Chandan(Cross - Defendant); Cheema, Mandeep(Cross - Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 04/21/2016 08:30:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2016
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Of Filing POS) filed. (Filed By: Oester, Jacquiline(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Oester, Jacquiline(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed. (Filed By: Mercy Court Associates LLC(Defendant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2015
  • Caldwell, Craig A added as a effective 10/15/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Oester, Jacquiline(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/21/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 09/18/2015 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Oester, Jacquiline(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Oester, Jacquiline(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less