This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/21/2017 at 18:25:44 (UTC).

Jacquelyn Haupt vs. Bryan College

Case Summary

On 04/08/2016 Jacquelyn Haupt filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bryan College. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2834

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Haupt, Jacquelyn

Defendants

Does 1-5

Bryan College

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert P Biegler

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Haupt, Jacquelyn(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Haupt, Jacquelyn(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Haupt, Jacquelyn(Plaintiff))

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/13/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/13/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

Case Management Statement filed.

Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Haupt, Jacquelyn(Plaintiff))

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/13/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/13/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 10/13/2016 08:30:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 10/13/2016 08:30:00 AM .

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2016
  • Past Hearings - Event Time: 8:30 AM; Event Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 36; Status: Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 10/13/2016 08:30:00 AM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program set on 10/13/2016 08:30:00 AM published .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed. (Filed By: Haupt, Jacquelyn(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Case assigned to Department 36 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 10/13/2016 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 36 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Haupt, Jacquelyn(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: Haupt, Jacquelyn(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: Haupt, Jacquelyn(Plaintiff))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less