This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/08/2017 at 19:14:34 (UTC).

J & A Jeffery Inc vs. American Engineering & Asphalt

Case Summary

On 06/24/2008 J A Jeffery Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against American Engineering Asphalt. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4049

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2008

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

J & A Jeffery Inc

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Cayler Company Inc

HD Supply White Cap Construction Supply

Livingston's Concrete Service Inc

Ahern Rentals Inc

Koslin Construction Inc

Kobra Propeties

United Rentals Northwest Inc

Calmat Co.

Bay Cities Crane and Rigging Inc

American Engineering & Asphalt

Koslin Constructions Inc

Roes 1-100

Stonegate Construction Inc

American Engineering & Asphalt Inc

J & A Jeffery Inc

Esau, Josie

International Business and Mercantile Reassurance Company

Central Pacific Bank

Kobra Properties

Does 1-50

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David R Anderson

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Suzanne M Nicholson

Conor H McElroy

Todd A Schaffer

Chris A McCandless

James D Lipschultz

Joshua G Genser

John P Garcia

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: J & A Jeffery Inc(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: J & A Jeffery Inc(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: J & A Jeffery Inc(Plaintiff))

Notice of Pendency of Action filed.

Notice of Pendency of Action filed. (Filed By: J & A Jeffery Inc(Plaintiff))

Notice of Related Case filed.

Notice of Related Case filed. (Filed By: J & A Jeffery Inc(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Bay Cities Crane and Rigging Inc(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Livingston's Concrete Service Inc(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Kobra Propeties(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Calmat Co.(Defendant))

Notice of Related Case filed.

Notice of Related Case filed. (Filed By: Calmat Co.(Defendant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: United Rentals Northwest Inc(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: United Rentals Northwest Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: J & A Jeffery Inc(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: J & A Jeffery Inc(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Ahern Rentals Inc(Cross - Complainant))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: American Engineering & Asphalt(Defendant))

Cross-Complaint filed.

Cross-Complaint filed. (Filed By: American Engineering & Asphalt(Cross - Complainant))

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: United Rentals Northwest Inc(Cross - Complainant))

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: United Rentals Northwest Inc(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: United Rentals Northwest Inc(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: United Rentals Northwest Inc(Cross - Complainant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • Roes 1-100 added as a Cross - Defendant effective 08/22/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • J & A Jeffery Inc added as a Cross - Defendant effective 08/22/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • Ahern Rentals Inc added as a Cross - Defendant effective 08/22/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • Cayler Company Inc added as a Cross - Defendant effective 08/22/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • HD Supply White Cap Construction Supply added as a Cross - Defendant effective 08/22/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • Bay Cities Crane and Rigging Inc added as a Cross - Defendant effective 08/22/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • Livingston's Concrete Service Inc added as a Cross - Defendant effective 08/22/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 06/27/2008
  • HD Supply White Cap Construction Supply added as a Defendant effective 06/24/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2008
  • Bay Cities Crane and Rigging Inc added as a Defendant effective 06/24/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2008
  • Livingston's Concrete Service Inc added as a Defendant effective 06/24/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Related Case filed. (Filed By: J & A Jeffery Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Pendency of Action filed. (Filed By: J & A Jeffery Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • Case assigned to Department 45 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons filed. (Filed By: J & A Jeffery Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: J & A Jeffery Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed. (Filed By: J & A Jeffery Inc(Plaintiff))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 06/24/2008 .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.