Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2017 at 03:18:03 (UTC).

In the matter of William Frederick Gryder

Case Summary

On 08/05/2016 In the matter of William Frederick Gryder was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8441

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Gryder, Brian W.

Gryder Jr, Roy W.

Administrator

Welborn, Janet K.

Decedent

Gryder, William Frederick

Not Classified By Court

Ferguson, Nancy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John B. Palley

Administrator Attorney

Barbara J Bender

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/11/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/11/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/11/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/11/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/09/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/09/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/25/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/25/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/22/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/22/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Gryder, Roy(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver Of Bond By Heir Or Beneficiary) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver Of Bond By Heir Or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Gryder, Roy(Petitioner))

Objection filed.

Objection filed. (Filed By: Gryder, Brian(Petitioner))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Gryder, Brian(Petitioner))

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Gryder, Brian(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Roy W. Gryder In Support Of Response To Contest Of Appointment Of Personal Representative) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Roy W. Gryder In Support Of Response To Contest Of Appointment Of Personal Representative) filed. (Filed By: Gryder, Roy(Petitioner))

Response filed.

Response filed. (Filed By: Gryder, Roy(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 11/09/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 11/09/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Order for Probate (Special Administrator)

Order for Probate (Special Administrator)

Letters of Special Administration filed.

Letters of Special Administration filed. (Filed By: Welborn, Janet(Special Administrator))

Notice - Other (Notice Of Association Of Counsel) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice Of Association Of Counsel) filed. (Filed By: Gryder, Brian(Petitioner))

Letters (Letters of Administration) filed.

Letters (Letters of Administration) filed. (Filed By: Gryder, Roy(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/22/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/22/2017 09:00:00 AM .

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Gryder, Roy(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/22/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Court appointed Nancy Ferguson as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Roy Gryder, Jr. as Administrator of the estate of William Frederick Gryder on 03/22/2017, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Ferguson, Nancy appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters (Letters of Administration) filed. (Filed By: Gryder, Roy(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order For Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • Bender, Barbara J added as a effective 03/20/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/22/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2016
  • Gryder, Brian W. added as a Petitioner effective 09/16/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit - Other (Waiver Of Bond By Heir Or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Gryder, Roy(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/11/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Gryder, Roy(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Gryder, Roy(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 10/11/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Waiver Of Bond By Heir Or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Gryder, Roy(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Gryder, Roy(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Gryder, Roy(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PALLEY JOHN BERNARD