Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2017 at 05:32:24 (UTC).

In the matter of William C Hollowell

Case Summary

On 08/29/2016 In the matter of William C Hollowell was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9486

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hollowell, Corey

Decedent

Hollowell, William C.

Not Classified By Court

Tucker, James R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Pamela Jones

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/12/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/12/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/12/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/12/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

Order For Probate

Order For Probate

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/12/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/12/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed.

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/12/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Court appointed James R Tucker as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Corey Hollowell as Administrator of the Estate of William Hollowell on 10/12/2016, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Tucker, James R appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order For Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/12/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/12/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 10/12/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Hollowell, Corey(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less