Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 06:49:06 (UTC).

In the matter of T.R. Mckee

Case Summary

On 01/29/2016 In the matter of T R Mckee was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9793

  • Filing Date:

    01/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Newton, Linda

Decedent

Mckee, T.R.

Not Classified By Court

Tucker, James R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Craig Christensen

 

Court Documents

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary filed.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary filed. (Filed By: Newton, Linda(Petitioner))

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 01/29/2016 .

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 01/29/2016 .

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Newton, Linda(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/22/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/22/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Newton, Linda(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/22/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/22/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Supplemental - Other filed.

Supplemental - Other filed. (Filed By: Newton, Linda(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Newton, Linda(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/22/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/22/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Newton, Linda(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Order For Probate

Order For Probate

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Will of T.R. McKee admitted into Probate.

Will of T.R. McKee admitted into Probate.

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Newton, Linda(Petitioner))

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters filed. (Filed By: Newton, Linda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Will of T.R. McKee admitted into Probate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Court appointed James R Tucker as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Will admitted to probate on 05/17/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Linda A. Newton as Executrix of the estate of T.R. McKee on 05/17/16, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Tucker, James R appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order For Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Newton, Linda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplemental - Other filed. (Filed By: Newton, Linda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/22/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Newton, Linda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/22/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Newton, Linda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 01/29/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 03/22/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary filed. (Filed By: Newton, Linda(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less