This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/06/2017 at 06:47:23 (UTC).

In the matter of Tim D Holden

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 In the matter of Tim D Holden was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4308

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sadowski, Tisha

Claimant

UC Davis Medical Center

Decedent

Holden, Tim D.

Not Classified By Court

Stover, Richard E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Tosh G Yamamoto

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Sadowski, Tisha(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Sadowski, Tisha(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Benficiary) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Benficiary) filed. (Filed By: Sadowski, Tisha(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Sadowski, Tisha(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/20/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/20/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Sadowski, Tisha(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/20/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/20/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Sadowski, Tisha(Petitioner))

Letters (Letters of Administration) filed.

Letters (Letters of Administration) filed. (Filed By: Sadowski, Tisha(Petitioner))

Order for Probate Administrator Order Authorizing Independent Administration of Estate with FULL Authority

Order for Probate Administrator Order Authorizing Independent Administration of Estate with FULL Authority

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: UC Davis Medical Center(Claimant))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/20/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/20/2017 09:00:00 AM .

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/20/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Court appointed Richard E. Stover as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Tisha Sadowski as Administrator of the estate of Tim Holden on 07/20/2017, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Stover, Richard E. appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: UC Davis Medical Center(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • UC Davis Medical Center added as a Claimant effective 07/17/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate Administrator Order Authorizing Independent Administration of Estate with FULL Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters (Letters of Administration) filed. (Filed By: Sadowski, Tisha(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Sadowski, Tisha(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/20/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Sadowski, Tisha(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/20/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Sadowski, Tisha(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Benficiary) filed. (Filed By: Sadowski, Tisha(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 07/20/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • Case assigned to Department 129 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Sadowski, Tisha(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Sadowski, Tisha(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less