Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 06:43:34 (UTC).

In the matter of Tami M Merryweather

Case Summary

On 01/28/2016 In the matter of Tami M Merryweather was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9709

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Roberts IV, Robert B.

Not Classified By Court

Notestein, Jerry

Decedent

Merryweather, Tami M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mark S Drobny

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/10/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/10/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/06/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/06/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 01/28/2016 .

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 01/28/2016 .

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

Order For Probate

Order For Probate

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

Notice to Creditors filed.

Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

Will of Tami Marie Merryweather admitted into Probate.

Will of Tami Marie Merryweather admitted into Probate.

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed.

Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

Order Approving Waiver Of First Report And Account of Executor And For Allowance, etc.

Order Approving Waiver Of First Report And Account of Executor And For Allowance, etc.

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/06/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/06/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Receipt - Other (Acknowledgment of Receipt) filed.

Receipt - Other (Acknowledgment of Receipt) filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order

Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Receipt - Other (Acknowledgment of Receipt) filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/06/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed by Robert Beverly Roberts, IV is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Approving Waiver Of First Report And Account of Executor And For Allowance, etc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/06/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 10/06/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order For Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/10/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 01/28/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 03/10/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Roberts, Robert(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DROBNY, MARK S.