Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/26/2017 at 10:00:39 (UTC).

In the matter of Steve Harry Geissinger

Case Summary

On 07/20/2016 In the matter of Steve Harry Geissinger was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7565

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Geissinger, Jill

Geissinger, Gina

Geissinger, Michael

Claimants

BANK OF AMERICA

CITIBANK N.A

Safe Credit Union

Financial center credit union

Capital One, N.A.

Decedent

Geissinger, Steve Harry

Not Classified By Court

Tucker, James R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Ashley B. Meyer

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/14/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/14/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/14/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/14/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner); Geissinger, Jill(Petitioner); Geissinger, Michael(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

Order For Probate

Order For Probate

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Capital One, N.A.(Claimant))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: CITIBANK N.A(Claimant))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

Notice to Creditors filed.

Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Financial center credit union(Claimant))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Safe Credit Union(Claimant))

Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed.

Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed.

Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed.

Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed.

Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Safe Credit Union(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • Safe Credit Union added as a Claimant effective 12/19/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: BANK OF AMERICA(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2016
  • BANK OF AMERICA added as a Claimant effective 12/08/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Financial center credit union(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order For Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/14/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 09/14/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Geissinger, Gina(Petitioner); Geissinger, Jill(Petitioner); Geissinger, Michael(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Safe Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases where Financial Center Credit Union is a litigant

Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant