Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 05:18:50 (UTC).

In the Matter of Stanley E. Lewis

Case Summary

On 01/12/2016 In the Matter of Stanley E Lewis was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8907

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Barnes, Leslie

Claimants

Wellman, Jennifer

Frisch, Maggie

Trustee

Lewis, Tracy R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Etan E Rosen

Claimant Attorney

Mitchell S Ostwald

Trustee Attorney

Mark A Campbell

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/05/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/05/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/14/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/14/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/14/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/14/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Notice - Other (Notice Of Pendency Of Action) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice Of Pendency Of Action) filed. (Filed By: Barnes, Leslie(Petitioner))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Barnes, Leslie(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Barnes, Leslie(Petitioner))

Motion - Other (Notice Of Motion And Motion To Quash Deposition Subpoena) filed.

Motion - Other (Notice Of Motion And Motion To Quash Deposition Subpoena) filed. (Filed By: Lewis, Tracy(Successor Trustee))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/17/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/17/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Notice - Other filed.

Notice - Other filed. (Filed By: Barnes, Leslie(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Barnes, Leslie(Petitioner))

Stipulation And Protective Order

Stipulation And Protective Order

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/05/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/05/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/14/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/14/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/14/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/14/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/13/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/13/2016 09:00:00 AM .

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal filed. (Filed By: Barnes, Leslie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/13/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Petition - Other (Case Initiation)(Petition To Set Aside Instruments Purported To Be Amendments To The Trust And Will Both Dated 11/21/2008.) filed by Leslie Barnes is dropped by the Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2016
  • Petition - Other (Case Initiation) has been Denied .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Request - Other (Request for Dismissal) filed. (Filed By: Barnes, Leslie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Other (Request for Dismissal) filed. (Filed By: Barnes, Leslie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/14/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • Matter dropped from calendar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/14/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Barnes, Leslie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Barnes, Leslie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Special Notice filed. (Filed By: Frisch, Maggie(Claimant); Wellman, Jennifer(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Ostwald, Mitchell S added as a effective 02/17/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Wellman, Jennifer added as a Claimant effective 02/17/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • Frisch, Maggie added as a Claimant effective 02/17/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Notice Of Pendency Of Action) filed. (Filed By: Barnes, Leslie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 03/17/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer De Alba, David .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition - Other (Case Initiation) (Petition To Set Aside Instruments Purported To Be Amendments To The Trust And Will Both Dated 11/21/2008.) filed. (Filed By: Barnes, Leslie(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Etan E Rosen