This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 16:36:11 (UTC).

In the matter of Sigrid E Penrose

Case Summary

On 04/08/2016 In the matter of Sigrid E Penrose was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3007

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Penrose, Stephen E.

Not Classified By Court

Stover, Richard E.

Decedent

Penrose, Sigrid E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Brady D McLeod

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/23/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/23/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/23/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/23/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/22/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/22/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/22/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/22/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/22/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/22/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Penrose, Stephen(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Penrose, Stephen(Petitioner))

Amended Petition submitted by Penrose, Stephen E rejected on 06/16/2016 .

Amended Petition submitted by Penrose, Stephen E rejected on 06/16/2016 . (Filed By: Penrose, Stephen(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Penrose, Stephen(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Penrose, Stephen(Petitioner))

Proof of Subscribing Witness filed.

Proof of Subscribing Witness filed. (Filed By: Penrose, Stephen(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Penrose, Stephen(Petitioner))

Declaration and Request of Brady McLeod to Correct Error in Lodging of Will

Declaration and Request of Brady McLeod to Correct Error in Lodging of Will

Supplemental - Other filed.

Supplemental - Other filed. (Filed By: Penrose, Stephen(Petitioner))

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Penrose, Stephen(Petitioner))

Order For Probate

Order For Probate

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/22/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/22/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Penrose, Stephen(Petitioner))

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Will of Sigrid E. Penrose Admitted into Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters filed. (Filed By: Penrose, Stephen(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/22/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Court appointed Richard E. Stover as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Will admitted to probate on 09/22/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Stephen Penrose as Executor of the Estate of Sigrid Penrose on 09/22/2016, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Stover, Richard E. appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Amended Petition has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/22/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • Matter dropped from calendar.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Petition submitted by Penrose, Stephen E rejected on 06/16/2016 . (Filed By: Penrose, Stephen(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Penrose, Stephen(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/23/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Penrose, Stephen(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Penrose, Stephen(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 04/08/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 06/23/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Penrose, Stephen(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Penrose, Stephen(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCLEOD BRADY DEAN