Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 15:58:02 (UTC).

In the matter of Rual A. Bucaro

Case Summary

On 04/01/2016 In the matter of Rual A Bucaro was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2438

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Moore, James A.

Conservatees

Bucaro, Coralia B.

Bucaro, Rual A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Frederick C Heise

Conservatee Attorney

Robert J Granucci

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 04/21/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/09/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/09/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 06/09/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 06/09/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 11/17/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 11/17/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/23/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/23/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2017
  • Notice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Bucaro, Coralia(Conservatee); Bucaro, Rual(Conservatee))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 07/06/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Court Appointed Counsel Compensation of Fees - Petition filed. (Filed By: Bucaro, Coralia(Conservatee); Bucaro, Rual(Conservatee))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/23/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Counsel for Raul Bucaro and Coralia Bucaro released.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Petition - Other(Petition For Authority To Sell Conservatee's Personal Residence; And For Approval Of Listing Agreement) filed by James Moore is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Petition - Other has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Notice of Entry - Other filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Order For Authority To Sell Conservatee's Personal Residence; and Approve Listing Agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
54 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Statement - Other (Statement Pursuant To Probate Code Section 2250(c) ET. Seq.) filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Declaration - Other (Petitioner's Disclosure RE: Payment Of Fees And Cost By Mercy Healthcare) filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Statement - Other (Professional Fiduciary's First Statement Regarding Compensation) filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Statement - Other (Professional Fiduciary's First Statement Regarding Compensation) filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • Notification to Court of Address on Conservatorship/Guardianship filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Verification that Video Tape of Conservator Duties Has Been Viewed filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian or Conservator filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Duties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed. (Filed By: Moore, James(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frederick C Heise