Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 15:05:03 (UTC).

In the matter of Ronald F Blanchard

Case Summary

On 03/22/2016 In the matter of Ronald F Blanchard was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1972

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Maniscalco, Ruth I.

Claimant

West, Ruby

Decedent

Blanchard, Ronald F.

Not Classified By Court

Ferguson, Nancy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Donald P Madsen

Claimant Attorney

Todd A Murray

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

Affidavit - Other filed.

Affidavit - Other filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

Affidavit - Other (Waiver Of Bond By Heir Or Beneficiary) filed.

Affidavit - Other (Waiver Of Bond By Heir Or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Notice to Creditors filed.

Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

Notice to Creditors filed.

Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

Request - Special Notice filed.

Request - Special Notice filed. (Filed By: West, Ruby(Claimant))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed.

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Accounting) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Accounting) filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 08/01/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition on Final Account with Additional Prayers filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Waiver of Accounting) filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Special Notice filed. (Filed By: West, Ruby(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • Murray, Todd A added as a effective 08/17/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • West, Ruby added as a Claimant effective 08/17/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Supplemental - Other filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit - Other filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 05/17/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Maniscalco, Ruth(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald P Madsen