Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 13:50:24 (UTC).

In the matter of Richard Myers

Case Summary

On 03/08/2016 In the matter of Richard Myers was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1361

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Myers, Judith

Claimants

Myers, Kara

Myers, David

Decedent

Myers, Richard

Not Classified By Court

Ferguson, Nancy

Interested Party

Berg, Lisa J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John B. Palley

Claimant Attorney

Stacey K. Brennan

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/03/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/03/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/03/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/03/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/05/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/05/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/05/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/05/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Judith Myers) filed.

Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Judith Myers) filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

Affidavit - Other (Waiver Of Bond By Heir Or Beneficiary) filed.

Affidavit - Other (Waiver Of Bond By Heir Or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

Affidavit - Other (2 waiver of bond) filed.

Affidavit - Other (2 waiver of bond) filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver Of Bond By Heir Or Beneficiary) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver Of Bond By Heir Or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

Request - Special Notice filed.

Request - Special Notice filed. (Filed By: Berg, Lisa(Interested Party))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/03/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/03/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Request - Special Notice filed.

Request - Special Notice filed. (Filed By: Myers, David(Claimant); Myers, Kara(Claimant))

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed.

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed.

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • Letter issued .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/05/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • Court appointed Nancy Ferguson as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/03/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit - Other (2 waiver of bond) filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 05/03/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit - Other (Waiver Of Bond By Heir Or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration Of Judith Myers) filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Myers, Judith(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PALLEY JOHN BERNARD