Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2017 at 05:32:39 (UTC).

In the matter of Ray Walker Price

Case Summary

On 08/29/2016 In the matter of Ray Walker Price was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9525

  • Filing Date:

    08/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Public Administrator

Decedent

Price, Ray Walker

Not Classified By Court

Tucker, James R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Catherine Spinelli

 

Court Documents

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed filed.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

Proof of Holographic Instrument filed.

Proof of Holographic Instrument filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

Declaration of Diligent Search filed.

Declaration of Diligent Search filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/01/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/01/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/01/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/01/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Proof of Holographic Instrument filed.

Proof of Holographic Instrument filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

Proof of Holographic Instrument filed.

Proof of Holographic Instrument filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

Order For Probate

Order For Probate

Letters (Letters of Sdministration w/Will Annexed) filed.

Letters (Letters of Sdministration w/Will Annexed) filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters (Letters of Sdministration w/Will Annexed) filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • Letters (Letters of Sdministration w/Will Annexed) filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order For Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Holographic Instrument filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Holographic Instrument filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/01/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Will admitted to probate on 12/01/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Court appointed James R Tucker as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints the Public Administrator as Administrator of the Estate of Ray Walker Price on 12/01/2016, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/01/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Diligent Search filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 12/01/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Holographic Instrument filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed filed. (Filed By: Public Administrator(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Public Administrator is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Catherine Spinelli