This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2017 at 01:18:27 (UTC).

In the matter of Ralph Salvemini

Case Summary

On 07/15/2016 In the matter of Ralph Salvemini was filed as a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7806

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Reed, Janice

Not Classified By Court

Conner, Linda

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Alexander W Munn

 

Court Documents

Petition Concerning the Internal Affairs of a Trust or to Determine the Existence of a Trust (Prob Code 17200) (Case Initiation) filed.

Petition Concerning the Internal Affairs of a Trust or to Determine the Existence of a Trust (Prob Code 17200) (Case Initiation) filed. (Filed By: Reed, Janice(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Reed, Janice(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Objection (Respondent Linda Conner's Objections and Response to Petition for Removal of Co-Trustee) filed.

Objection (Respondent Linda Conner's Objections and Response to Petition for Removal of Co-Trustee) filed. (Filed By: Conner, Linda(Objector))

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Reed, Janice(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/21/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 09/21/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Affidavit - Other (Alternative Dispute Resolution Certification and Selection Form) filed.

Affidavit - Other (Alternative Dispute Resolution Certification and Selection Form) filed. (Filed By: Conner, Linda(Objector))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/25/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/25/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/25/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/25/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/22/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/22/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/22/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/22/2017 09:00:00 AM .

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/22/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate continued to 06/07/2017 at 09:00 in this department.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 06/07/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 06/07/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/22/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/25/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate continued to 03/22/2017 at 09:00 in this department.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 03/22/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 03/22/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/25/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 10/26/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Reed, Janice(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Objection (Respondent Linda Conner's Objections and Response to Petition for Removal of Co-Trustee) filed. (Filed By: Conner, Linda(Objector))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • Conner, Linda added as a Objector effective 09/14/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Reed, Janice(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 09/21/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition Concerning the Internal Affairs of a Trust or to Determine the Existence of a Trust (Prob Code 17200) (Case Initiation) filed. (Filed By: Reed, Janice(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less