Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 20:42:57 (UTC).

In the matter of Paul Roy Williams

Case Summary

On 05/24/2016 In the matter of Paul Roy Williams was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4937

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hardre, Michele

Claimant

Dept of Health Care Services

Not Classified By Court

Stover, Richard E.

Decedent

Williams, Paul Roy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Mark S Drobny

 

Court Documents

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed filed.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed filed. (Filed By: Hardre, Michele(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other filed.

Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Hardre, Michele(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Hardre, Michele(Petitioner))

Proof of Holographic Instrument filed.

Proof of Holographic Instrument filed. (Filed By: Hardre, Michele(Petitioner))

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 05/24/2016 .

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 05/24/2016 .

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Hardre, Michele(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/18/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/18/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Response to Calendar Notes filed.

Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Hardre, Michele(Petitioner))

Order Appointing Administrator with Will Annexed

Order Appointing Administrator with Will Annexed

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Hardre, Michele(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/18/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/18/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Will of Paul Roy Williams Admitted into Probate

Will of Paul Roy Williams Admitted into Probate

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Hardre, Michele(Petitioner))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Dept of Health Care Services(Claimant))

Request - Special Notice filed.

Request - Special Notice filed. (Filed By: Dept of Health Care Services(Claimant))

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Special Notice filed. (Filed By: Dept of Health Care Services(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Dept of Health Care Services(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • Dept of Health Care Services added as a Claimant effective 10/19/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Hardre, Michele(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Will of Paul Roy Williams Admitted into Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/18/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Will admitted to probate on 08/18/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Court appointed Richard E. Stover as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Michele Hardre as Administrator of the Estate of Paul Roy Williams on 08/18/16, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2016
  • Stover, Richard E. appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Hardre, Michele(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/18/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Hardre, Michele(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 05/24/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Holographic Instrument filed. (Filed By: Hardre, Michele(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 08/18/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Hardre, Michele(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Hardre, Michele(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed filed. (Filed By: Hardre, Michele(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DROBNY, MARK S.