This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 15:21:17 (UTC).

In the matter of Patsy Ruth Trujillo

Case Summary

On 03/25/2016 In the matter of Patsy Ruth Trujillo was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2184

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Trujillo, Rogelio

Decedent

Trujillo, Patsy Ruth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Matthew A. Scott

 

Court Documents

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Trujillo, Rogelio(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Trujillo, Rogelio(Petitioner))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Trujillo, Rogelio(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Trujillo, Rogelio(Petitioner))

Amendment filed.

Amendment filed. (Filed By: Trujillo, Rogelio(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Trujillo, Rogelio(Petitioner))

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/25/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/25/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Trujillo, Rogelio(Petitioner))

Substitution of Attorney filed.

Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Trujillo, Rogelio(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/25/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/25/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/13/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/13/2016 09:00:00 AM .

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/13/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Rogelio Trujillo is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act has been Denied .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/13/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/25/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate continued to 07/13/2016 at 09:00 in this department.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 07/13/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 07/13/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Substitution of Attorney filed. (Filed By: Trujillo, Rogelio(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Trujillo, Rogelio(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/25/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Trujillo, Rogelio(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amendment filed. (Filed By: Trujillo, Rogelio(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 05/25/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Trujillo, Rogelio(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Trujillo, Rogelio(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Trujillo, Rogelio(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Trujillo, Rogelio(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew A. Scott