Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 15:15:48 (UTC).

In the matter of Norman C Millert

Case Summary

On 03/24/2016 In the matter of Norman C Millert was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2133

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Millert, Randall

Not Classified By Court

Tucker, James R.

Decedent

Millert, Norman C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Randall R Wilson

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/20/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/20/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/20/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/20/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

Order For Probate

Order For Probate

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Notice - Other (Notice of Death to FTB) filed.

Notice - Other (Notice of Death to FTB) filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

Notice to Creditors filed.

Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Account By Distributee) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Account By Distributee) filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

Order Approving Report of Administrator on Waiver of Account; etc.

Order Approving Report of Administrator on Waiver of Account; etc.

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/20/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/20/2016 09:00:00 AM .

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 12/20/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed by Randall Millert is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Approving Report of Administrator on Waiver of Account; etc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/20/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Calendar Notes filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 12/20/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 12/20/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 05/17/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit - Other (2 waiver of bond filed) filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 05/17/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Millert, Randall(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Randall R Wilson