Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2017 at 05:43:19 (UTC).

In the matter of Nancy Ellen Cooley

Case Summary

On 08/31/2016 In the matter of Nancy Ellen Cooley was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********9636

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cooley, Mark David

Claimant

Global Receivables Sultions, Inc

Not Classified By Court

Tucker, James R.

Decedent

Cooley, Nancy Ellen

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond By Heir or Beneficiary) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond By Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond By Heir or Beneficiary) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond By Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Amended Order Appointing Administrator with Will Annexed

Amended Order Appointing Administrator with Will Annexed

Amendment filed.

Amendment filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Global Receivables Sultions, Inc(Claimant))

Will of Nancy Ellen Cooley Admitted into Probate

Will of Nancy Ellen Cooley Admitted into Probate

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed.

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

Notice to Creditors filed.

Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed.

Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Will of Nancy Ellen Cooley Admitted into Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Global Receivables Sultions, Inc(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Global Receivables Sultions, Inc added as a Claimant effective 11/17/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amendment filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Amended Order Appointing Administrator with Will Annexed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond By Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/26/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 10/26/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Holographic Instrument filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Cooley, Mark(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less