Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 22:07:41 (UTC).

In the matter of Myrtle M Watson

Case Summary

On 06/09/2016 In the matter of Myrtle M Watson was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********5645

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Johnson, Debra

Richie, Shirley Ann

Conservatee

Watson, Myrtle M.

Not Classified By Court

Tucker, James R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservatee Attorney

Victor Waid

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/24/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/24/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/24/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/24/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/24/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/24/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/02/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/02/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/02/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/02/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 11/02/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 11/02/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/04/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/04/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/04/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/04/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/08/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/08/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/08/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/08/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/08/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/08/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/08/2017 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/08/2017 09:00:00 AM .

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2017
  • Notice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Watson, Myrtle(Conservatee))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • Court Appointed Counsel Compensation of Fees - Petition filed. (Filed By: Watson, Myrtle(Conservatee))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Letter issued .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Letters of Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: Johnson, Debra(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • Order Appointing Probate Conservator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/08/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Court appointed James R Tucker as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • The Court orders assessment fee waived.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2017
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Debra Johnson as Conservator of the person and estate of Myrtle Watson on 03/08/2017, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 11/02/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 11/02/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/24/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/24/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 08/24/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Richie, Shirley(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Notification to Court of Address on Conservatorship/Guardianship filed. (Filed By: Richie, Shirley(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Duties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed. (Filed By: Richie, Shirley(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed. (Filed By: Richie, Shirley(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Victor Waid