Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 23:53:29 (UTC).

In the matter of Mitchell Dee Senteney

Case Summary

On 06/29/2016 In the matter of Mitchell Dee Senteney was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6676

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Senteney, Madison

Decedent

Senteney, Mitchell Dee

Not Classified By Court

Tucker, James R.

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/24/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/24/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/19/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/19/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/19/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/19/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/04/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/04/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/04/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/04/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Senteney, Madison(Petitioner))

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed.

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Senteney, Madison(Petitioner))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Senteney, Madison(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Senteney, Madison(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Senteney, Madison(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/24/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/24/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed.

Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Senteney, Madison(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/19/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/19/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond By Heir or Beneficiary) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond By Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Senteney, Madison(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Senteney, Madison(Petitioner))

Order for Probate

Order for Probate

Letters submitted by Senteney, Madison rejected on 01/30/2017 .

Letters submitted by Senteney, Madison rejected on 01/30/2017 . (Filed By: Senteney, Madison(Petitioner))

Letters (Letters of Administration) filed.

Letters (Letters of Administration) filed. (Filed By: Senteney, Madison(Petitioner))

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters (Letters of Administration) filed. (Filed By: Senteney, Madison(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters submitted by Senteney, Madison rejected on 01/30/2017 . (Filed By: Senteney, Madison(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 01/04/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Court appointed James R Tucker as the Probate Referee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Petition is granted. The Court appoints Madison Senteney as Administratrix of the estate of Mitchell Senteney on 01/04/17, Letters are to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Tucker, James R appointed as Probate Referee .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act has been Granted .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/04/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/04/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 10/19/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 10/19/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Senteney, Madison(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/24/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Senteney, Madison(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 08/24/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Senteney, Madison(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Senteney, Madison(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Senteney, Madison(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less