This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/06/2017 at 03:54:26 (UTC).

In the matter of Milton G Baygell

Case Summary

On 07/05/2011 In the matter of Milton G Baygell was filed as a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********6369

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2011

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Baygell, Ruth

Baygell, Noah A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Edward J Corey, Jr

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/31/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/31/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/31/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/31/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/31/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/31/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/31/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/31/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/16/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/16/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/16/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/16/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/16/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/16/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/16/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/16/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/11/2012 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 01/11/2012 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition - Other (Case Initiation) (Petition To Determine Construction of Trust Provisions) filed.

Petition - Other (Case Initiation) (Petition To Determine Construction of Trust Provisions) filed. (Filed By: Baygell, Noah(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing filed.

Notice of Hearing filed. (Filed By: Baygell, Noah(Petitioner))

Petition concerning the internal affairs of a trust or to determine the existence of a trust (Prob Code 17200) filed.

Petition concerning the internal affairs of a trust or to determine the existence of a trust (Prob Code 17200) filed. (Filed By: Baygell, Ruth(Petitioner))

Notice of Hearing filed.

Notice of Hearing filed. (Filed By: Baygell, Ruth(Petitioner))

Proof of Service filed.

Proof of Service filed. (Filed By: Baygell, Ruth(Petitioner))

Letter Re: Continued Hearing

Letter Re: Continued Hearing

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/31/2011 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/31/2011 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/31/2011 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 08/31/2011 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 11/16/2011 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 11/16/2011 09:00:00 AM .

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/29/2012 09:00:00 AM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • DocketThe Petition for Hearing - Probate set for 2/29/2012 at 9:00 am in Department 129 is vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • DocketPetition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 02/29/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse was vacated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 02/29/2012 09:00:00 AM .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • DocketThe Petition for Hearing - Probate set for 2/29/2012 at 9:00 am in Department 129 is vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • DocketPetition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 02/29/2012 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse was vacated .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/29/2012 09:00:00 AM published .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 02/29/2012 09:00:00 AM published .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed. (Filed By: Baygell, Noah(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2012
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed. (Filed By: Baygell, Ruth(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed. (Filed By: Baygell, Ruth(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed. (Filed By: Baygell, Ruth(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/31/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProbate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 08/31/2011 09:00:00 AM published .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • DocketPetition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 08/31/2011 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 128 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition concerning the internal affairs of a trust or to determine the existence of a trust (Prob Code 17200) filed. (Filed By: Baygell, Ruth(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed. (Filed By: Baygell, Noah(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • DocketPetition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 08/31/2011 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Krueger, Christopher .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition - Other (Case Initiation) (Petition To Determine Construction of Trust Provisions) filed. (Filed By: Baygell, Noah(Petitioner))

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COREY EDWARD JOSEPH JR