Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/14/2017 at 02:29:51 (UTC).

In the matter of Mark S Anton

Case Summary

On 07/27/2016 In the matter of Mark S Anton was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********7952

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Anton, Janet

Claimants

J & L collection services, INC

Sacramento Metropolitan Fire Dept.

Stanislaus Credit Control Services

Not Classified By Court

Ferguson, Nancy

Decedent

Anton, Mark S.

Interested Party

State Board of Equalization

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Tracy L. Poston Shows

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/04/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/04/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

Surety Bond filed.

Surety Bond filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

Order For Probate

Order For Probate

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/04/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 10/04/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Notice to Creditors filed.

Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

Notice to Creditors filed.

Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

Notice to Creditors filed.

Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

Notice to Creditors filed.

Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: J & L collection services, INC(Claimant))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Stanislaus Credit Control Services(Claimant))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Sacramento Metropolitan Fire Dept.(Claimant))

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed.

Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

Creditor's Claim filed.

Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: State Board of Equalization(Interested Party))

Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed.

Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed.

Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Allowance or Rejection of Creditors Claim filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: State Board of Equalization(Interested Party))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • State Board of Equalization added as a Interested Party effective 03/09/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Proposed Action (Objection-Consent) filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Sacramento Metropolitan Fire Dept.(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Sacramento Metropolitan Fire Dept. added as a Claimant effective 01/11/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed. (Filed By: Stanislaus Credit Control Services(Claimant))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • Stanislaus Credit Control Services added as a Claimant effective 01/09/2017 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Creditors filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order For Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Surety Bond filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/04/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 10/04/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Anton, Janet(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J & L COLLECTION SERVICES INC. DBA J & L TEAMWORKS is a litigant

Latest cases where Stanislaus Credit Control Service, Inc. is a litigant