Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 19:44:00 (UTC).

In the matter of Marjorie Jo Parnello

Case Summary

On 05/13/2016 In the matter of Marjorie Jo Parnello was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4600

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wertkin, Diana

Not Classified By Court

Tucker, James R.

Decedent

Parnello, Marjorie Jo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kathleen Morgan Martinez

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/06/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/06/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/06/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/06/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed.

Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

Proof of Holographic Instrument filed.

Proof of Holographic Instrument filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 05/13/2016 .

A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 05/13/2016 .

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond By Heir or Beneficiary) filed.

Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond By Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed.

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

Proof of Publication filed.

Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

Order - Other submitted by Martinez, Kathleen Morgan rejected on 07/06/2016 .

Order - Other submitted by Martinez, Kathleen Morgan rejected on 07/06/2016 . (Filed By: Martinez, Kathleen(Attorney))

Supplemental - Other filed.

Supplemental - Other filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

Supplemental - Other filed.

Supplemental - Other filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/06/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 07/06/2016 09:00:00 AM .

Order Appointing Executor

Order Appointing Executor

Letters filed.

Letters filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

Will of Marjorie Parnello Admitted into Probate

Will of Marjorie Parnello Admitted into Probate

Inventory and Appraisal filed.

Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers submitted by Wertkin, Diana rejected on 03/28/2017 .

Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers submitted by Wertkin, Diana rejected on 03/28/2017 . (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed.

Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2017
  • Notice of Hearing - Decendent's Estate or Trust (DE-120) filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • Amendment filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 06/21/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Final Distribution with Additional Prayers submitted by Wertkin, Diana rejected on 03/28/2017 . (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Will of Marjorie Parnello Admitted into Probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • Letter issued .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Appointing Executor

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Waiver of Bond By Heir or Beneficiary) filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/06/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • A Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated on 05/13/2016 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 07/06/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Holographic Instrument filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed. (Filed By: Wertkin, Diana(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less