Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/13/2017 at 12:33:46 (UTC).

In the matter of Mario Washington

Case Summary

On 02/29/2016 In the matter of Mario Washington was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0961

  • Filing Date:

    02/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Baker, Ranetta

Conservatee

Washington, Mario

Interested Party

PUBLIC GUARDIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Conservatee Attorney

Leland J Ellison

Interested Party Attorney

Martha E Potiriades

 

Court Documents

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 07/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/15/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 09/15/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/18/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/18/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/18/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 10/18/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/29/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/29/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/29/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/29/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/29/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/29/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/29/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 11/29/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/09/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/09/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/19/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/19/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/19/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/19/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 06/21/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2017
  • Letter issued .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Letters of Temporary Guardianship or Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN(Conservator))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Petition for Hearing - Probate heard on 03/09/2017 09:00:00 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate continued to 06/15/2017 at 09:00 in this department.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 06/15/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 06/15/2017 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 03/09/2017 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2017
  • Notice of Hearing-Guardianship or Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN(Conservator))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • Letters of Temporary Guardianship or Conservatorship filed. (Filed By: PUBLIC GUARDIAN(Interested Party))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Order After Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 06/21/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate rescheduled to 06/21/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/19/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Notes for Petition for Hearing - Probate set on 04/19/2016 09:00:00 AM published .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Baker, Ranetta(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Notification to Court of Address on Conservatorship/Guardianship filed. (Filed By: Baker, Ranetta(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Petition for Hearing - Probate scheduled for 04/19/2016 at 09:00:00 AM in Department 129 at William R Ridgeway Family Relations Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Gevercer, Steven .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Duties of Conservator and Acknowledgment of Receipt of Handbook filed. (Filed By: Baker, Ranetta(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • Petition for Appointment of Probate Conservator filed. (Filed By: Baker, Ranetta(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less